This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2020 at 10:29:01 (UTC).

Micke v. Missouri State Highway Patrol et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Micke filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Missouri State Highway Patrol. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry Edward Autrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00954

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott M. Micke

Scott M. Arnold Micke

Defendants

Matthew Becker

Union, MO 63084

Franklin County Sheriff's Department

Missouri State Highway Patrol

1510 Elm Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Det. Sgt. Ralph E. Finn

Sullivan, MO 630880

Sullivan Police Department

400 East Locust

Union, MO 63084

Unknown Detective

Sullivan, MO 63080

Robert Parks

Washington, MO 63090

Multi-County Narcotics and Violence Enforcement Unit

Robert E. Parks

Franklin County, Missouri

Ralph E. Finn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan S. Cohen

210 S. Bemiston Avenue

Clayton, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

John Terry Brooks

Attorney at NEWMAN COMLEY PC

601 Monroe Street, Suite 301

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Michael G. Berry

Attorney at NEWMAN COMLEY PC

601 Monroe Street, Suite 301

Jefferson City, MO 65101

John Michael Berosky, Jr

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MISSOURI

815 Olive Street, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#20

#19

#18

#16

#13

#5

4 #1

Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service

#4

3 #1

Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service

#3

2 #1

Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Defendant Franklin County Sheriff's Department. (Brooks, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Franklin County Sheriff's Department. (Brooks, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by John Terry Brooks for Defendants Franklin County Sheriff's Department, Franklin County, Missouri. (Brooks, John) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ENTRY of Appearance by John Terry Brooks for Defendant Multi-County Narcotics and Violence Enforcement Unit. (Brooks, John) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri State Highway Patrol by Plaintiff Scott M. Arnold Micke. (Cohen, Nathan) filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke ; AN ADDITIONAL 21 DAYS IS GRANTED IN WHICH TO ENTER APPEARANCE AND/ OR FILE MOTION TO DISMISS. ( Response to Court due by 9/21/2020.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on August 31, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri State Highway Patrol by Plaintiff Scott M. Arnold Micke. (Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke Ralph E. Finn waiver signed on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke Sullivan Police Department waiver signed on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri State Highway Patrol filed by Defendant Missouri State Highway Patrol. (Berosky, John) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Party Missouri State Highway Patrol by Defendant Missouri State Highway Patrol. (Berosky, John) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER of Service issued defendantMatthew Becker. sent to Matthew C. Becker, Esq., Franklin County Prosecuting Attorney's Office on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of Service issued defendantRobert E. Parks. sent to Robert E. Parks, Esq. on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER of Service issued defendantUnknown Detective. sent to Unknown Detective on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER of Service issued defendantRalph E. Finn. sent to Ralph Finn, Detective on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER of Service issued defendantMulti-County Narcotics and Violence Enforcement Unit. sent to Multi-County Narcotics and Violence Enforcement Unit, Steven M. Pelton, Franklin County Sheriff on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER of Service issued defendantSullivan Police Department. sent to Sullivan Police Department, Chief of Police George Counts on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER of Service issued defendantFranklin County, Missouri. sent to Franklin County, Missouri, Tim Brinker, Commissioner on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER of Service issued defendantFranklin County Sheriff's Department. sent to Franklin County Sheriff's Department, Steven M. Pelton, Sheriff on 07/24/2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER of Service issued defendantMissouri State Highway Patrol. sent to Missouri State Highway Patrol on July 24, 2020 filed by Scott M. Arnold Micke. Waiver of Service due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8033672, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Scott M. Micke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Missouri State Highway Patrol is a litigant

Latest cases where Franklin County Sheriff Department is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan S. Cohen(Designation Retained)