This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2020 at 14:18:56 (UTC).

Micke, Allen v. Saul, Andrew

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 Micke, Allen filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul, Andrew. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter A. Oppeneer and Barbara B. Crabb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00532

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peter A. Oppeneer

Presiding Judge

Barbara B. Crabb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen J. Micke

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Alan Schultz

Attorney at Law Offices of Barry A. Schultz

1609 Sherman Ave., Ste. 205

Evanston, IL 60201

Defendant Attorneys

Albert Bianchi, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

222 W. Washington Avenue, Ste. 700

Madison, WI 53703

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

200 West Adams Street, 30Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office) (voc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/15/2020. (voc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (voc) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Allen J. Micke. (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Allen J. Micke. (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul., filed by Allen J. Micke. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Schultz, Barry) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less