This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2021 at 08:10:20 (UTC).

Mick Levin PLC et al v. Medicopy Services Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Mick Levin PLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Medicopy Services Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine and Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01604

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Deborah M Fine

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mick Levin PLC

3401 N 32Nd St.

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Bache & Lynch PLLC

Marcos Morales

John Novac

Defendants

Medicopy Services Incorporated a Foreign For-Profit (Business) Corporation doing business as Medicopy

American Medical Response of Maricopa LLC

Mayo Clinic Arizona

Ciox Health LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as IOD Incorporated

Ciox Health LLC

Hospital Development of West Phoenix Incorporated a Foreign For-Profit (Business) Corporation doing business as Abrazo West Campus

Yuma Regional Medical Center

Orthopedic Specialists of North America PLLC Arizona Professional Limited Liability Company doing business as OrthoArizona

Record Reproduction Services LLC

Record Reproduction Services LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as RRS Medical LLC

ScanStat Technologies LLC

Banner Medical Group an Arizona Nonprofit Corporation doing business as The Orthopedic Clinic Association

Sharecare Health Data Services LLC

HonorHealth

Sonoran Orthopaedic Trauma Surgeons PLLC

Tucson Medical Center

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mick Levin

Attorney at Mick Levin PLC

3401 N 32Nd St.

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorneys

Carlyle Washington Hall, III

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Maria Fernanda Hubbard

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jay Philip Lefkowitz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - New York, NY

601 Lexington Ave.

New York, NY 10022

Joseph Myer Sanderson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - New York, NY

601 Lexington Ave.

New York, NY 10022

David B Rosenbaum

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Joseph Nathaniel Roth

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Joseph M Sanderson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - New York, NY

601 Lexington Ave.

New York, NY 10022

Douglas Tyler Milliron, Jr.

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP - Scottsdale, AZ

8601 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 300

Scottsdale, AZ 85253-2742

Michael W Sillyman

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP - Scottsdale, AZ

8601 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 300

Scottsdale, AZ 85253-2742

Paul Sullivan Gerding, Jr.

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP - Scottsdale, AZ

8601 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 300

Scottsdale, AZ 85253-2742

Daniel Price Crane

Attorney at Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Eric B Hull

Attorney at Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Geoffrey S Kercsmar

Attorney at Kercsmar Feltus & Collins PLLC

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Keith Beauchamp

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Marki Anne Stewart

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Other Attorneys

Andrew Mark Federhar

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016-4251

Jessica Anne Gale

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016-4251

 

Court Documents

52 #3

Affidavit Declaration of Jami Woebkenberg

52 #2

Affidavit Declaration of Craig McCoy inn Support of Ciox Health Opposition to Pl

52 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Joseph Myer Sanderson in Support of Ciox Health Opposit

#52

(#52) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ciox Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph Myer Sanderson in Support of Ciox Health Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Craig McCoy inn Support of Ciox Health Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jami Woebkenberg)(Roth, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#51

(#51) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bache & Lynch PLLC, Mick Levin PLC, Marcos Morales, John Novac.(Levin, Mick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

50 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Bache & Lynch PLLC, Mick Levin PLC, Marcos Morales, John Novac . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Levin, Mick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#49

(#49) ORDER the joint #48 motion is granted. Defendant Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc. is subject to the schedule approved in this Court's order at docket no. #47 as though it were among the Stipulating Defendants referenced in that order. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/29/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#42

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #42 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ciox Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph Myer Sanderson in Support of Ciox Health Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Craig McCoy inn Support of Ciox Health Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jami Woebkenberg)(Roth, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bache & Lynch PLLC, Mick Levin PLC, Marcos Morales, John Novac.(Levin, Mick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Bache & Lynch PLLC, Mick Levin PLC, Marcos Morales, John Novac . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Levin, Mick) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER the joint #48 motion is granted. Defendant Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc. is subject to the schedule approved in this Court's order at docket no. #47 as though it were among the Stipulating Defendants referenced in that order. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/29/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roth, Joseph) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting the #46 Stipulation Regarding First Amended Complaint and Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a first amended complaint no later than 11/1/2021. Stipulating Defendants shall have until 12/13/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall have until 1/13/2022 to file their response(s) to any motion(s) to dismiss. Stipulating Defendants shall have until 2/10/2022 to file their replies in support of the motion(s) to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/27/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Stipulation Regarding First Amended Complaint and Responses Thereto by Banner Health, Banner Medical Group, Dignity Health, HonorHealth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beauchamp, Keith) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER re: #39 Stipulation For Extension of Time; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant HealthSouth Valley of the Sun Rehabilitation Hospital, LLC d/b/a Encompass Health Valley of the Sun to respond to the complaint is postponed pending the submission of a proposed schedule for an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/20/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Summons Issued as to Sonoran Orthopaedic Trauma Surgeons PLLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SUMMONS Submitted by Mick Levin PLC. (Levin, Mick) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal (Motion to Alter Caption and Amend Complaint) by Bache & Lynch PLLC, Mick Levin PLC, Marcos Morales, John Novac. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) NOTE: Filed in State Court on 8/26/2021 and docketed in District Court pursuant to #7 Notice of Pending Motion.(MFR) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ciox Health LLC(a Foreign Limited Liability Company) identifying Other Affiliate Smart Holdings Corporation for Ciox Health LLC. (Roth, Joseph) *Modified docket text on 9/22/2021 (MFR). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE re: Pending Motion by Ciox Health LLC(a Foreign Limited Liability Company) re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) . (Roth, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal (Civil Cover Sheet) by Defendants Ciox Health LLC, Ciox Health LLC. (Roth, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 3.6(d). FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a "Notice" of Pending Motion. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ciox Health LLC(a Foreign Limited Liability Company). (SCA) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Ciox Health LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19879262. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01604-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (SCA) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/01/2021 to HealthSouth Valley of the Sun Rehabilitation Hospital LLC dba Encompass Health Valley of the Sun. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 09/02/2021). SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/09/2021 to ScanStat Technologies LLC. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 09/09/2021). SERVICE EXECUTED : Notice of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Ciox Health LLC on 08/19/2021.(Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 09/09/2021). (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-012712. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19879262 filed by Ciox Health LLC(a Foreign Limited Liability Company). (Roth, Joseph) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(SCA) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ScanSTAT Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tucson Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Mayo Clinic Arizona is a litigant

Latest cases where Yuma Regional Medical Center is a litigant