This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2019 at 07:36:26 (UTC).

Michon v. Judd et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Michon against Judd in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02189

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Michon

Pinellas Park, FL 33780

Defendants

Polk County Sheriff's Office

Grady C. Judd, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Grady C. Judd, Jr., Polk County Sheriff's Office filed by Matthew Michon. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(DG) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#2

(#2) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/29/2019. (BK) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing the clerk to SEND to Michon a Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form; directing Michon, by 10/21/2019, either to file the fully completed form or to pay the $400 fee. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/5/2019. (BK) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/29/2019. (BK) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing the clerk to SEND to Michon a Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form; directing Michon, by 10/21/2019, either to file the fully completed form or to pay the $400 fee. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/5/2019. (BK) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Grady C. Judd, Jr., Polk County Sheriff's Office filed by Matthew Michon. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(DG) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.