This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2019 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters' Employee Benefits Fund et al v. Hudson Interiors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters' Employee Benefits Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hudson Interiors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George Caram Steeh and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12539

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Caram Steeh

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters' Annuity Fund

Michigan Statewide Carpenters and Millwrights Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Carpenters' Special Assessment Fund

Carpenters' Industry Advancement Fund

Carpenters' Apprentice Reimbursement Fund

Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters' Employee Benefits Fund

Carpenters' Labor Management Productivity and Training Fund

Carpenters' Guaranty Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America

Carpenters' Working Dues Fund

Defendants

Hudson Interiors, Inc.

Mark Hudson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan M. Beckerman

Attorney at Novara, Tesija,

2000 Town Center, Suite 2370

Southfield, MI 48075-1314

Defendant Attorney

Deborah S. Kaleta

Attorney at Deneweth, Dugan,

1175 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 202

Troy, MI 48098

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Plaintiffs' attorney to initiate conference call with defendants' attorney and call court at 313-234-5175. (MBea) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hudson Interiors, Inc. (Kaleta, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Kaleta, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Deborah S. Kaleta appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Kaleta, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mark Hudson served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hudson Interiors, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Hudson Interiors, Inc.* (SKra) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Mark Hudson* (SKra) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2-2

1 #3

Exhibit 2-1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7384417 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: OAKLAND - County Where Action Arose: OAKLAND - County of 1st Defendant: MACOMB. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Plaintiffs' attorney to initiate conference call with defendants' attorney and call court at 313-234-5175. (MBea) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hudson Interiors, Inc. (Kaleta, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Kaleta, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Deborah S. Kaleta appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Kaleta, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mark Hudson served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hudson Interiors, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Hudson Interiors, Inc.* (SKra) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Mark Hudson* (SKra) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7384417 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: OAKLAND - County Where Action Arose: OAKLAND - County of 1st Defendant: MACOMB. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund is a litigant