This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2020 at 07:37:51 (UTC).

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund et al v. BRD, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against BRD, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew F. Leitman and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-13661

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Leitman

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund

CARPENTERS WORKING DUES FUND

Michigan Fund for the Advancement of the Carpentry Trade

Michigan Statewide Carpenters and Millwrights Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund

Carpenters Industry Advancement Fund

Carpenters Guaranty Fund

Carpenters Special Assessment Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Employee Benefits Fund

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund

Carpenters Pension Trust Fund - Detroit and Vicinity

Michigan Regional Council of Carpenters, United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America

Carpenters Labor Management Productivity and Training Fund

Defendants

Lois Davis

BRD, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan M. Beckerman

Attorney at Novara, Tesija,

2000 Town Center, Suite 2370

Southfield, MI 48075-1314

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Correction re #10 Order Dismissing Case. (HMon) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#10

(#10) [STRICKEN - SEE ECF #11] ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) Modified on 1/31/2020 (HMon). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2020 Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Ex Parte MOTION Injunctive Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BRD, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lois Davis served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Lois Davis* (LGra) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *BRD, Inc.* (LGra) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2-2

1 #3

Exhibit 2-1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7522663 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCase reopened. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Correction re #10 Order Dismissing Case. (HMon) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [STRICKEN - SEE ECF #11] ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) Modified on 1/31/2020 (HMon). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2020 Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MOTION Injunctive Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BRD, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lois Davis served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Lois Davis* (LGra) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *BRD, Inc.* (LGra) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7522663 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3) (Beckerman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Michigan Fund for the Advancement of the Carpentry Trade is a litigant

Latest cases where Carpenters Apprentice Reimbursement Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Carpenters Special Assessment Fund is a litigant