This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2022 at 10:20:07 (UTC).

Michetti v. Taylor Trucking LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Michetti filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Taylor Trucking LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Michetti

Defendants

Taylor Trucking LLC

Northland Insurance Company

Ronald Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Scott Robinson

Attorney at Farah and Farah

11102 Abercorn Street, Unit A

Savannah, GA 31419

Defendant Attorneys

Evan David Szczepanski

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Parkway, Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

Edwin Andrew Treese

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Pkwy., Se, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDERED that the Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction over the case at this time, and the case shall proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/7/22. (wwp) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Notice of Removal by Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC. (Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER directing the Defendants to provide sufficient evidence within fourteen days of the date of this Order that the jurisdictional amount is in controversy. (Compliance due by 11/3/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/20/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2022; Discovery due by 4/17/2023; Motions due by 6/13/2023; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 1/17/2023; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 2/16/2023; and Status Report due by 4/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/20/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE that Discovery is not filed with the Court re 11 Certificate of Service re Initial Disclosures, 12 Certificate of Service re Initial Disclosures. (thb) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC.(Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Taylor Trucking LLC, Northland Insurance Company. (Treese, Edwin) Modified on 9/29/2022 (thb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Clerk's Extension ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Northland Insurance Company answer due 9/30/2022; Ronald Smith answer due 9/30/2022; Taylor Trucking LLC answer due 9/30/2022.. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/16/2022. (pts) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Andrew Treese on behalf of Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC (Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2022. (Szczepanski, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Scott Robinson on behalf of Frank Michetti (Robinson, Bradley) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

3 #1

Forms

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INTENDING TO APPEAR IN THE REFERENCED MATTER MUST ENTER A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR A MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE NO LATER THAN TEN (10) DAYS AFTER THE ISSUANCE OF THIS NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/19/2022. (pts) Modified on 9/12/2022 (thb). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

1 #2

Notice

1 #1

State Court Record

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDERED that the Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction over the case at this time, and the case shall proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/7/22. (wwp) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Notice of Removal by Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC. (Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER directing the Defendants to provide sufficient evidence within fourteen days of the date of this Order that the jurisdictional amount is in controversy. (Compliance due by 11/3/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/20/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2022; Discovery due by 4/17/2023; Motions due by 6/13/2023; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 1/17/2023; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 2/16/2023; and Status Report due by 4/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/20/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE that Discovery is not filed with the Court re 11 Certificate of Service re Initial Disclosures, 12 Certificate of Service re Initial Disclosures. (thb) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC.(Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Taylor Trucking LLC, Northland Insurance Company. (Treese, Edwin) Modified on 9/29/2022 (thb). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Extension ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Northland Insurance Company answer due 9/30/2022; Ronald Smith answer due 9/30/2022; Taylor Trucking LLC answer due 9/30/2022.. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/16/2022. (pts) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro no longer assigned to the case. (pts) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Andrew Treese on behalf of Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC (Treese, Edwin) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (thb) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Northland Insurance Company, Ronald Smith, Taylor Trucking LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2022. (Szczepanski, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Scott Robinson on behalf of Frank Michetti (Robinson, Bradley) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INTENDING TO APPEAR IN THE REFERENCED MATTER MUST ENTER A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR A MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE NO LATER THAN TEN (10) DAYS AFTER THE ISSUANCE OF THIS NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/19/2022. (pts) Modified on 9/12/2022 (thb). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court of Bulloch County, case number SUCV2022000178. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3423081) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Notice) (pts) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less