This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2019 at 07:51:32 (UTC).

Michaels Stores, Inc. v. Jones

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Michaels Stores, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00090

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michaels Stores, Inc.

Defendant

Tiffany Y. Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather Dawn Hearne

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

4605 Bluebonnet Blvd., Suite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Christine S. Keenan

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

4605 Bluebonnet Blvd., Suite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorney

Scott D. Wilson

Attorney at Scott D. Wilson, APLC

533 Europe Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Michaels Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1899109.), filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hearne, Heather) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/11/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Tiffany Y. Jones.(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 2/25/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 02/19/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

1 #3

Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. Tiffany Y. Jones served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Tiffany Y. Jones, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.(Hearne, Heather) Modified on 2/25/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Tiffany Y. Jones.(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Tiffany Y. Jones. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Tiffany Y. Jones.(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Tiffany Y. Jones, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.(Hearne, Heather) Modified on 2/25/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Tiffany Y. Jones.(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 2/25/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 02/19/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. Tiffany Y. Jones served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Tiffany Y. Jones. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Michaels Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1899109.), filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hearne, Heather) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/11/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less