This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:27:14 (UTC).

Michael Stokes v. Universal Music Group Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Michael Stokes filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Universal Music Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00370

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Stokes

Mike Stokes

Michael Stokes also known as Mike Stokes doing business as Willow Girl Music doing business as Skytower Music

Defendants

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Concord Music Group, Inc.

Warner Chappell Music, Inc.

Sony ATV Music Publishing Group

Sony Music Entertainment

Universal Music Group Inc.

The Bicycle Music Company, Inc.

Concord Music Publishing

Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc.

Bike Music

Warner Music Group

Craft Recordings

Kobalt Music Services America, Inc.

Universal Music Distribution

Kobalt Music Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samantha E Mirabello

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul N Philips APLC

468 North Camden Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Paul N Philips

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul N Philips APLC

468 North Camden Drive, 2Nd Floor, Beverly Hills

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley J Mullins

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3120

David A Steinberg

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3120

Robert S Besser

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Besser

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Christopher Wills Chapin

Attorney at Law Offices of Christopher Chapin

110 Forest Lane

San Rafael, CA 94930

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order re STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RE

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Exhibit Addendum 2

3 #1

Exhibit Addendum 1

#3

2 #1

Exhibit Attachment 1

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet CV-71

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 21, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Sony ATV Music Publishing Group, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Group Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3))(Mullins, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Concord Music Publishing answer now due 3/20/2020; Concord Music Group, Inc. answer now due 3/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Concord Music Publishing; Concord Music Group, Inc..(Attorney Robert S Besser added to party Concord Music Publishing(pty:dft))(Besser, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (i) as to Warner Music Group. (Philips, Paul) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley J Mullins counsel for Defendants Sony ATV Music Publishing Group, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Group Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc.. Adding Bradley J. Mullins as counsel of record for Universal Music Group, Inc.; UMG Recordings, Inc.; Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment; and Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Universal Music Group, Inc.; UMG Recordings, Inc.; Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment; and Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC. (Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party Sony ATV Music Publishing Group(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party Universal Music Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley J Mullins added to party Warner Chappell Music, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mullins, Bradley) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Corrected Proof of Service (Philips, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Universal Music Group Inc. answer now due 3/22/2020; Sony ATV Music Publishing Group answer now due 3/22/2020; Sony Music Entertainment answer now due 3/22/2020; Warner Chappell Music, Inc. answer now due 3/22/2020; UMG Recordings, Inc. answer now due 3/22/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Universal Music Group Inc.; Sony ATV Music Publishing Group; Sony Music Entertainment; Warner Chappell Music, Inc.; UMG Recordings, Inc..(Attorney David A Steinberg added to party Sony ATV Music Publishing Group(pty:dft), Attorney David A Steinberg added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:dft), Attorney David A Steinberg added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David A Steinberg added to party Universal Music Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David A Steinberg added to party Warner Chappell Music, Inc.(pty:dft))(Steinberg, David) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Concord Music Group, Inc..(Attorney Robert S Besser added to party Concord Music Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Besser, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Sony ATV Music Publishing Group served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Judy Carkner, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirabello, Samantha) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Warner Music Group served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Registered Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirabello, Samantha) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Warner Chappell Music, Inc. served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Registered Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirabello, Samantha) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Bike Music served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Bautista, Authorized Agent for Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirabello, Samantha) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Concord Music Group, Inc. served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin Bautista, Authorized Agent for Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mirabello, Samantha) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Philips, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bike Music, Concord Music Group, Inc., Concord Music Publishing, Craft Recordings, Kobalt Music Group, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., Kobalt Music Services America, Inc., Sony ATV Music Publishing Group, Sony Music Entertainment, The Bicycle Music Company, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Distribution, Universal Music Group Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Group. (lh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1, #2 Exhibit Addendum 2)(Philips, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Universal Music Group, Inc, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Philips, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25116327 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CV-71) (Attorney Paul N Philips added to party Michael Stokes(pty:pla))(Philips, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOBALT MUSIC PUBLISHING AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Concord Music Group Inc is a litigant