This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2021 at 10:20:40 (UTC).

Michael Stokes v. Den LA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Michael Stokes filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Den LA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Abrams, Fernando M. Olguin and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07938

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

Presiding Judges

Paul L. Abrams

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Stokes

Defendants

Den LA LLC

Damon Holzum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig B Sanders

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Justin D Sobodash

Attorney at Law Office of Justin Sobodash P.C

8335 West Sunset Boulevard Suite 366

West Hollywood, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Notice

18 #18

Main Document

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-07938 FMO(PDx). (rn) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#14

(#14) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (ch) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendants Damon Holzum, Den LA LLC.(Attorney Justin D Sobodash added to party Den LA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D Sobodash added to party Damon Holzum(pty:dft))(Sobodash, Justin) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Den LA LLC served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Damon M. Holzum- Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Damon Holzum served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Damon M. Holzum in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#9

#8

7 #1

CV11C

7 #7

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Notice) (iv) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-07938 FMO(PDx). (rn) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (ch) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendants Damon Holzum, Den LA LLC.(Attorney Justin D Sobodash added to party Den LA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin D Sobodash added to party Damon Holzum(pty:dft))(Sobodash, Justin) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Den LA LLC served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Damon M. Holzum- Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, upon Defendant Damon Holzum served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Damon M. Holzum in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Damon Holzum. (esa) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Den LA LLC. (esa) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes, identifying Sanders Law Group, Craig B. Sanders, Den LA LLC, Damon Holzum. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Stokes. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32098704 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Michael Stokes(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less