This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 13:29:50 (UTC).

Michael R. Spengler v. Boy Scouts of America

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Michael R Spengler filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Boy Scouts of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Sheri Pym. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11382

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael R. Spengler

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant

Boy Scouts of America

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Case should have been closed on entry dated 12/30/20 #5 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93). DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Boy Scouts of America pursuant to Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (ghap) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Case should have been closed on entry dated 12/30/20 #5 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93). DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Referring Claim to Bankruptcy Claims Agent (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2020: #1 Civil Rights Complaint) (kca). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Boy Scouts of America pursuant to Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (ghap) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant