This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 07:47:18 (UTC).

Michael Mogan v. Airbnb Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Michael Mogan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Airbnb Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Mogan

Chicago, IL 60630

Defendants

Airbnb Inc.

Dawn Sestito

Damali Taylor

DAVE WILLNER

Jeff Henry

SANAZ EBRAHINI

Omelveny and Myers LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael S Mogan

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Mogan

4803 North Milwaukee Avenue Suite B Unit 244

Chicago, IL 60630

Defendant Attorneys

Dawn Sestito

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Damali A. Taylor

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jillian R Weinstein

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #29 AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) #30 filed by Defendants Airbnb Inc., Dawn Sestito. (Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

30 #9

Proposed Order

30 #6

Exhibit E

30 #5

Exhibit D

30 #4

Exhibit C

30 #2

Exhibit A

30 #1

Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice

#30

(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #29 AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) filed by Defendants' Airbnb Inc., Dawn Sestito. Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order) (Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#29

(#29) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Michael Mogan amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan(Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan, (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#28) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Airbnb Inc. answer now due 2/15/2023; Dawn Sestito answer now due 2/15/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Airbnb Inc..(Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #29 AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) #30 filed by Defendants Airbnb Inc., Dawn Sestito. (Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan, upon Defendant Damali Taylor served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Damali Taylor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,, #32 served on March 3, 2023. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #29 AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) #30 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Michael Mogan In Support Of Opposition To Defendant Airbnb Inc. and Dawn Sestitos Motion To Strike and Motion To Dismiss, #2 Supplement Plaintiffs Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Opposition To Defendant Airbnb Inc. and Dawn Sestitos Motion To Strike and Motion To Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on March 24, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by March 14, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 Amended Complaint/Petition #29 AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) filed by Defendants' Airbnb Inc., Dawn Sestito. Motion set for hearing on 3/24/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order) (Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Michael Mogan amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan(Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Airbnb Inc. answer now due 2/15/2023; Dawn Sestito answer now due 2/15/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Airbnb Inc..(Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND L.R. 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Airbnb Inc. (Sestito, Dawn) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dawn Sestito, identifying O'Melveny & Myers LLP. (Weinstein, Jillian) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan, (Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-34597517 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Michael Mogan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Michael S Mogan added to party Michael Mogan(pty:pla))(Mogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less