This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:03:51 (UTC).

Michael Ludin et al v. The Directors Guild of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Michael Ludin filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Directors Guild of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb, Kenly Kiya Kato, George H. Wu and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01586

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John W. Holcomb

George H. Wu

Referral Judges

Kenly Kiya Kato

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Ludin

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Michael Grossman

Rancho Mirace, CA 92270

Defendants

The Directors Guild of America

The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan

Alliance for Motion Picture and Television Producers

Lisa Read

Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

J Paul Moorhead

Attorney at Bush Gottlieb ALC

801 North Brand Boulevard Suite 950

Glendale, CA 91203

Lisa C Demidovich

Attorney at Bush Gottlieb ALC

801 North Brand Boulevard Suite 950

Glendale, CA 91203

Michael Williams Stevens

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nolan R Theurer

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Stephen Bradley Perkins

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa C Demidovich counsel for Defendant The Directors Guild of America. Adding Lisa C. Demidovich as counsel of record for The Directors Guild of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Directors Guild of America. (Attorney Lisa C Demidovich added to party The Directors Guild of America(pty:dft))(Demidovich, Lisa) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan, (on Plaintiffs of documents filed by Defendant to date) served on October 29, 2021. (Stevens, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#20

(#20) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Paul Moorhead counsel for Defendant The Directors Guild of America. Adding J. Paul Moorhead as counsel of record for The Directors Guild of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Directors Guild of America. (Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party The Directors Guild of America(pty:dft))(Moorhead, J) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #16 , Notice of Appearance, #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nolan R Theurer on behalf of Defendants Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan (Attorney Nolan R Theurer added to party Lisa Read(pty:dft), Attorney Nolan R Theurer added to party The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan(pty:dft))(Theurer, Nolan) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Williams Stevens on behalf of Defendants Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan (Attorney Michael Williams Stevens added to party Lisa Read(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Williams Stevens added to party The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan(pty:dft))(Stevens, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION to Waive Service filed by Defendant Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan.(Attorney Stephen Bradley Perkins added to party Lisa Read(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Bradley Perkins added to party The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan(pty:dft))(Perkins, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (et) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:16-cv-01840-GW(SPx). Case transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01586-GW(SPx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (ap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Lodged Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa C Demidovich counsel for Defendant The Directors Guild of America. Adding Lisa C. Demidovich as counsel of record for The Directors Guild of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Directors Guild of America. (Attorney Lisa C Demidovich added to party The Directors Guild of America(pty:dft))(Demidovich, Lisa) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan, (on Plaintiffs of documents filed by Defendant to date) served on October 29, 2021. (Stevens, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Paul Moorhead counsel for Defendant The Directors Guild of America. Adding J. Paul Moorhead as counsel of record for The Directors Guild of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Directors Guild of America. (Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party The Directors Guild of America(pty:dft))(Moorhead, J) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #16 , Notice of Appearance, #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nolan R Theurer on behalf of Defendants Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan (Attorney Nolan R Theurer added to party Lisa Read(pty:dft), Attorney Nolan R Theurer added to party The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan(pty:dft))(Theurer, Nolan) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Williams Stevens on behalf of Defendants Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan (Attorney Michael Williams Stevens added to party Lisa Read(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Williams Stevens added to party The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan(pty:dft))(Stevens, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION to Waive Service filed by Defendant Lisa Read, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan.(Attorney Stephen Bradley Perkins added to party Lisa Read(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Bradley Perkins added to party The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan(pty:dft))(Perkins, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendants Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC, Alliance for Motion Picture and Television Producers, Lisa Read, The Directors Guild of America, The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Ludin, upon Defendant The Trustees of Directors Guild of America-Producers Health Plan served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Vance, Operation Lead in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ludin, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Michael Ludin, upon Defendant Lisa Read served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ludin, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Ludin, upon Defendant Alliance for Motion Picture and Television Producers served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Reception/US MAIL Room in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Grossman Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service by USPS, #3 Exhibit Request to dots. for Subtituion of service by mail, #4 Exhibit CV-21 form, #5 Exhibit Request for Service agent for Dft. AMPTP)(Ludin, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (et) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:16-cv-01840-GW(SPx). Case transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01586-GW(SPx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (ap) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Michael Ludin. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (car) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Michael Grossman, Michael Ludin (car) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato.(Filing fee $ 402 PAID), filed by Plaintiffs Michael Ludin, Michael Grossman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trustees of the Directors Guild of America - Producer Pension Plans is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED MEDICAL REVIEWS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FDBA ADVANCED MEDICAL REVIEWS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa C Demidovich