This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:11:56 (UTC).

Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. v. Livingly Media, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Michael Grecco Productions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Livingly Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.

Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Michael Grecco Photography

Defendants and Counter Claimants

DOES 1 through 10

Livingly Media, Inc.

DOES 1 - 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Frank Gregory Casella

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Joshua Koltun

Attorney at Joshua Koltun, Attorney

One Sansome Street, Suite 2450 No.500

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#20

(#20) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-04776 DSF(PJWx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00151 DSF(PJWx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.to Notice of Related Case(s) #17 (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc. (a Delaware corporation). Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-04776; 2:19-cv-07826 (Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc..(Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Michael Grecco Productions, Inc..(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc., identifying Aufeminin, S.A., Groupe TF-1, AXIS Insurance Company, AXIS Capital Holdings Limited. (Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#11

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 2/6/2020, or the answer may be stricken. (vdr) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Livingly Media, Inc. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Erica Carter - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Livingly Media, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc..(Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-04776 DSF(PJWx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-00151 DSF(PJWx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.to Notice of Related Case(s) #17 (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc. (a Delaware corporation). Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-04776; 2:19-cv-07826 (Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc..(Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Michael Grecco Productions, Inc..(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Livingly Media, Inc., identifying Aufeminin, S.A., Groupe TF-1, AXIS Insurance Company, AXIS Capital Holdings Limited. (Koltun, Joshua) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 2/6/2020, or the answer may be stricken. (vdr) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Livingly Media, Inc. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Erica Carter - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Livingly Media, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25068071 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less