This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2020 at 08:00:45 (UTC).

MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. v. 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-07466

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive, Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Ryan Evan Carreon

Attorney at Higbee & Associates

1504 Brookhollow Dr., Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography. 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Carreon, Ryan) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/25/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#12

(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography.. (Carreon, Ryan) (Filed on 11/23/2020) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/4/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#10

(#10) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form e-mailed to register). (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew Higbee (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography re #1 Complaint, (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15106058.). Filed byMICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography. 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Carreon, Ryan) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 26, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by January 19th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-07466-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/25/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography.. (Carreon, Ryan) (Filed on 11/23/2020) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/4/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form e-mailed to register). (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to the Register of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright form AO 121 using the event Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents Copyright, within five days of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew Higbee (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by MICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography re #1 Complaint, (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 8 Decimal Capital Management, LLC, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15106058.). Filed byMICHAEL GRECCO PRODUCTIONS, INC. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E Carreon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee