This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:11:53 (UTC).

Michael Grecco Productions Inc. v. Nerdist Industries, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Michael Grecco Productions Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Nerdist Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00148

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.

Michael Grecco Productions, Inc.

Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Michael Grecco Photography

Defendants

Nerdist Industries, LLC

DOES 1 through 10

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Frank Gregory Casella

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Jana A Slavina Farmer

Attorney at Wilson Elser

1133 Westchester Avenue Suite 1

White Plains, NY 10604

Ian A Stewart

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO MARCH 27, 2020 #14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 27, 2020 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #11 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by defendant Nerdist Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ian A Stewart added to party Nerdist Industries, LLC(pty:dft))(Stewart, Ian) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Every Separately filed document is to have it's own formal title page and its required LR 11-3.8 information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Does, Nerdist Industries, LLC, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #11 served on 01/30/2020. (Farmer, Jana) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Does answer now due 2/28/2020; Nerdist Industries, LLC answer now due 2/28/2020; Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. answer now due 2/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Defendant Does; Nerdist Industries, LLC.(Attorney Jana A Slavina Farmer added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Jana A Slavina Farmer added to party Nerdist Industries, LLC(pty:dft))(Farmer, Jana) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Nerdist Industries, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emily Reedkeef - Reception in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #2 as to defendant Nerdist Industries, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25067594 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO MARCH 27, 2020 #14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 27, 2020 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #11 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by defendant Nerdist Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ian A Stewart added to party Nerdist Industries, LLC(pty:dft))(Stewart, Ian) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Every Separately filed document is to have it's own formal title page and its required LR 11-3.8 information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Does, Nerdist Industries, LLC, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #11 served on 01/30/2020. (Farmer, Jana) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Does answer now due 2/28/2020; Nerdist Industries, LLC answer now due 2/28/2020; Michael Grecco Productions, Inc. answer now due 2/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Defendant Does; Nerdist Industries, LLC.(Attorney Jana A Slavina Farmer added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Jana A Slavina Farmer added to party Nerdist Industries, LLC(pty:dft))(Farmer, Jana) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., upon Defendant Nerdist Industries, LLC served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emily Reedkeef - Reception in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #2 as to defendant Nerdist Industries, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25067594 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. d/b/a Michael Grecco Photography, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less