This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2020 at 07:57:38 (UTC).

Michael et al v. Old Republic National Title Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Michael filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00525

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephanie J Michael

James L Michael, Jr.

Defendants

Old Republic National Title Insurance Company

Old Republic International Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard Clay Hodges, Jr.

Attorney at Harris Surratt & Hodges, LLP

3948 Browning Place, Suite 334

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorney

Zipporah Basile Edwards

Attorney at Horack Talley Pharr & Lowndes, P.A.

301 S. College Street, 2600 One Wells Fargo Center

Charlotte, NC 28202-6038

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/9/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant ORIC by Stephanie J Michael, James L Michael, Jr (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

(#11) Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie J Michael (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

10 #1

Certificate of Service

#10

(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by James L Michael, Jr (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Howard Clay Hodges, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - NC Business Court Opinion

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Title Insurance Policy

#8

(#8) Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Old Republic International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Title Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - NC Business Court Opinion) (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Old Republic International Corporation. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Zipporah Basile Edwards on behalf of All Defendants. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Verified Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/9/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant ORIC by Stephanie J Michael, James L Michael, Jr (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie J Michael (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by James L Michael, Jr (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Howard Clay Hodges, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hodges, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Old Republic International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Title Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - NC Business Court Opinion) (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Old Republic International Corporation. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Zipporah Basile Edwards on behalf of All Defendants. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' Counsel H. Clay Hodges of Harris Sarratt & Hodges, LLP at 3948 Browning Place, Suite 334, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on November 20, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Old Republic International Corporation (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Old Republic International Corporation, Old Republic National Title Insurance Company from Wake County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-14268. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5191548), filed by Old Republic International Corporation, Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal of Civil Action) (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC INTERNATIONAL (DBA OREXCO AS QI FOR FUSHION BAMA LLC) (A is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic National Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zipporah Basile Edwards