This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:03:52 (UTC).

Michael Strauch et al v. Diamond Resorts Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Michael Strauch filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Diamond Resorts Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STRAUCH MICHAEL

STRAUCH ERNA

Michael Strauch

Erna Strauch

Defendants

Diamond Resorts Corporation

Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC

Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc.

GARCIA JONATHAN

Jonathan Garcia

DOES 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell Reed Sussman

Attorney at Mitchell Reed Sussman and Associates

1053 South Palm Canyon Drive

Palm Springs, CA 92264

Juliet Marie Sussman

Attorney at Mitchell Reed Sussman and Associates

1053 South Palm Canyon Drive

Palm Springs, CA 92264

Defendant Attorneys

Germain D. Labat, III

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder LLP

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey A. Backman

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder PA

200 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1800

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Richard W. Epstein

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder PA

200 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1800

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Roy Taub

Attorney at Greenspoon Marder PA

200 East Broward Boulevard, Suite 1800

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #21 . (twdb) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Erna Strauch, Michael Strauch. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Sussman, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/22/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROY TAUB to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt #14 , (twdb) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection LLC, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc and Jonathan Garcia, designating Germain D. Labat as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

12 #12

Main Document

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #21 . (twdb) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Erna Strauch, Michael Strauch. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Sussman, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROY TAUB to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt #14 , (twdb) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection LLC, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc and Jonathan Garcia, designating Germain D. Labat as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Epstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection LLC, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc and Jonathan Garcia, designating Germain D. Labat as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC, Jonathan Garcia. (Labat, Germain) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Mitchell Sussman on behalf of Plaintiffs Erna Strauch, Michael Strauch. Filed by Plaintiffs Erna Strauch, Michael Strauch (Attorney Juliet Marie Sussman added to party Erna Strauch(pty:pla), Attorney Juliet Marie Sussman added to party Michael Strauch(pty:pla))(Sussman, Juliet) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROY TAUB to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACAC #12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ROY TAUB to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32642957) filed by Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Labat, Germain) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Jonathan Garcia, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC.(Labat, Germain) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Roy Taub. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Epstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Erna Strauch, Michael Strauch in Orange County Superior Court on 11/223/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC, GARCIA JONATHAN identifying Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC (parent), Hilton Grand Vacations, Inc. (publicly-traded company that, indirectly, is the ultimate owner of 10% or more of the party's stock) as Corporate Parent. (Labat, Germain) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: ACACDC-32579475 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants GARCIA JONATHAN, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc., Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Germain D. Labat, III added to party Diamond Resorts Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Germain D. Labat, III added to party Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Germain D. Labat, III added to party Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Germain D. Labat, III added to party GARCIA JONATHAN (pty:dft))(Labat, Germain) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diamond Resorts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Diamond Resorts Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Reed Sussman