Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 07:19:46 (UTC).

Michael Blais et al v. Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On March 3, 2021, Michael Blais, individually and as Estate Trustee, Personal Representative, and proper successor-in-interest of the estates of Jody Claude Blais and Nicole Aline Blais (hereinafter the “Plaintiffs”) Steve Guy Blais and Eric Robert Blais, individually and as children of their deceased parents, represented by Kimberly Barone Baden of Motley Rice LLC filed a personal injury lawsuit against Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell Aerospace, Rolls-Royce Corporation and Rolls-Royce North America Inc.,(collectively, “Defendants”) seeking damages, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest among other reliefs for alleged injury caused due to mechanical failure of a Robinson Helicopter R66 helicopter. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judge Christina A. Snyder, Judge Maria A. Audero, and Judge John F. Walter presiding. 

 

Plaintiffs in their complaint alleged that “On or about October 2010 RHC obtained type certification from the Federal Aviation Administration (hereinafter “FAA”) for production of its new five place turbine powered R66 helicopter. The RHC R66 is a 5-seat helicopter with a maximum gross weight of 2700 pounds. In January 2016, RHC sold R66 serial number 0142 to Decedent Jody Blais. The R66, and specifically C-CAUA was powered by the Rolls-Royce RR300 engine. The RR300 engine has fuel control units and other components manufactured by Honeywell. On March 4, 2019, C-CAUA, experienced a mechanical failure and crashed during flight near Timmons, Ontario, killing JODY CLAUDE BLAIS and NICOLE ALINE BLAIS.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “the subject accident was caused, in whole or in part, by the improper, inadequate and ineffective corporate inspection techniques, design, manufacturing, assembly, modification, re-engining, overhaul, training, procedures, documentation, and communications involving the subject aircraft and components which were not properly manufactured, assembled, modified, installed, adapted to, appropriate for, maintained and repaired by the Defendants. Defendants had a duty to exercise reasonable care in the design, manufacture, installation, modification, assembly, re-engining, maintenance and repair of the aircraft and manuals designed, certified, tested, manufactured and sold by the Defendants including the subject aircraft engine, fuel controls, aircraft components and manuals as well as a duty to ensure that the same were adequate and effective, and that their personnel were properly trained and fully aware of all documentation and communications prepared by Defendants regarding this aircraft.” and even further that “The warranty of merchantability was breached by Defendants, and each of them, in that the R66 helicopter and its components were not of fair or average quality as compared to other helicopters made by competitors or of the same quality as others manufactured or maintained by Defendants, and each of them, resulting in the crash, injuries, and delay, as alleged herein.”



There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim for relief is for Negligence and the other claims are for wrongful death and survival , strict product liability and breach of warranties. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the court to account and pay for the personal suffering and personal injury, financial support the Decedents would have contributed, loss of gifts or benefits, Funeral and burial expenses, the reasonable value of household service, the loss of love, companionship, loss of Decedents’ training and guidance; Personal property damages and loss, Prejudgment and post-judgment interest along with costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01968

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steve Guy Blais

Eric Robert Blais

Michael Blais

Defendants

Honeywell Aerospace

Rolls-Royce Corporation

Honeywell International, Inc.

Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.

Rolls-Royce North America Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kimberly Barone Baden

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Jennie L Scudder-Levin

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

James R. Brauchle

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

38 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Mary Schiavo

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

John P. Kristensen

Attorney at Kristensen LLP

12540 Beatrice Street Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. upon Honeywell International, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Michael G. McQuillen. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#34

(#34) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. Waiver of Service signed by Tim A. Goetz. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#33

(#33) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais, upon Defendant Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Tim A. Goetz, Attorney. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#32

(#32) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais, upon Defendant Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carmen Gobinez, Person Authorized to Accept Service for Business in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Jennie L. Scudder-Levin to James R. Brauchle. filed by Plaintiff Michael Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Eric Robert Blais, (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#30

(#30) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. upon Rolls-Royce North America Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by J. Denny Shupe. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#29

(#29) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. upon Rolls-Royce Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by J. Denny Shupe. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#28

(#28) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Barone Baden counsel for Plaintiffs Michael Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Eric Robert Blais. Kimberly D. Barone Baden is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly D. Barone Baden. (Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#27

(#27) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney James Brauchle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Blais, designating John Kristensen as local counsel #24 . (iv) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-01968 JFW(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James R Brauchle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mary Schiavo. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#5

(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #5 filed by Plaintiff Michael Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Eric Robert Blais. (Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The civil cover sheet is attached to the complaint. It should have been filed as a separate document under its correct event. You need not respond to this notice regarding this item. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

23 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. upon Honeywell International, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Michael G. McQuillen. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. Waiver of Service signed by Tim A. Goetz. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais, upon Defendant Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Tim A. Goetz, Attorney. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais, upon Defendant Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carmen Gobinez, Person Authorized to Accept Service for Business in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Jennie L. Scudder-Levin to James R. Brauchle. filed by Plaintiff Michael Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Eric Robert Blais, (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. upon Rolls-Royce North America Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by J. Denny Shupe. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. upon Rolls-Royce Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Waiver of Service signed by J. Denny Shupe. (Brauchle, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Barone Baden counsel for Plaintiffs Michael Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Eric Robert Blais. Kimberly D. Barone Baden is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly D. Barone Baden. (Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney James Brauchle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Blais, designating John Kristensen as local counsel #24 . (iv) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Mary Schiavo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Blais, designating John Kristensen as local counsel #23 . (iv) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #5 filed by Plaintiff Michael Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Eric Robert Blais. (Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-01968 JFW(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James R Brauchle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mary Schiavo. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Each request to issue summons should be filed under its proper event, summons request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The civil cover sheet is attached to the complaint. It should have been filed as a separate document under its correct event. You need not respond to this notice regarding this item. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30830132 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eric Robert Blais, Steve Guy Blais, Michael Blais. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Attorney Kimberly Barone Baden added to party Michael Blais(pty:pla), Attorney Kimberly Barone Baden added to party Steve Guy Blais(pty:pla), Attorney Kimberly Barone Baden added to party Eric Robert Blais (pty:pla))(Baden, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rolls-Royce North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rolls-Royce Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant