This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 09:00:07 (UTC).

MHREZ v. CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 MHREZ filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01598

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABDELFATTAH MHREZ

Defendant

CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL ZEMEL

Attorney at ZEMEL LAW LLC

660 Broadway

Paterson, NJ 07514

Defendant Attorney

AARON RAPHAEL EASLEY

Attorney at SESSIONS, ISRAEL& SHARTLE, LLC

3 Cross Creek Drive

Flemington, NJ 08822

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. identifying Convergent Resources, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

3 #2

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ABDELFATTAH MHREZ re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (ZEMEL, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ABDELFATTAH MHREZ re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (ZEMEL, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#6

(#6) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ABDELFATTAH MHREZ re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (ZEMEL, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ABDELFATTAH MHREZ re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (ZEMEL, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketJudge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. identifying Convergent Resources, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. from Superior Court Hudson County, case number HUD-L-000394-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13273363), filed by CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron R. Easley Esq.