This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:18:34

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Civil Right - Education Discrimination case was filed by Golliday, on behalf of M G , a minor against Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District 187 in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-00791
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Civil Right - Education Discrimination
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Mark A. Beatty
  • Courthouse Illinois Southern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187
  • Represented By
    • Jason T. Manning
    • Donald J. Ohl
  • Defendant Illinois State Board of Education
  • Represented By
    • Taylor Traynoff
  • Plaintiff M.G., a minor
  • Represented By
    • Thomas E. Kennedy, III
  • Plaintiff Antwynette Golliday
  • Represented By
    • Thomas E. Kennedy, III
    • Sarah Jane Hunt
    • Thomas E. Kennedy, III

Court Documents

#22

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#31

(#31) ANSWER to Complaint by Board of Education of Cahokia C...

Fees Apply
#30

(#30) First MOTION for Leave to File Answer Under Seal by Bo...

Fees Apply
28 #1

Consent to Magistrate Judge

Fees Apply
#28

(#28) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set f...

Fees Apply
#26

(#26) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Board of Education o...

Fees Apply
#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Answer Under Seal by Illinois...

Fees Apply
#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Traynoff on behalf of I...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • (#31) ANSWER to Complaint by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187.(Manning, Jason) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#30) First MOTION for Leave to File Answer Under Seal by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187. (Manning, Jason) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
  • 09/10/2019
  • (#29) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 1188. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/10/2019. (arf) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#28) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for September 2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Donald J. Ohl terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/9/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/09/2019)
  • 09/06/2019
  • (#26) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187. (Ohl, Donald) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#25) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #21 Motion for Leave to File filed by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187, #20 Notice of Appearance filed by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187, #22 Sealed Document filed by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187. Filer selected the incorrect party as the filer the correct party is Illinois State Board of Education. Document text has been modified to reflect the correct party. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (trb) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#24) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant Illinois State Board of Education is GRANTED leave to file its answer under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/26/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#23) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #21 Motion for Leave to File filed by Illinois State Board of Education , #22 Sealed Document filed by Illinois State Board of Education When leave is requested to file a document the document should not be filed until leave is granted. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (trb) Modified on 8/27/2019 (trb). (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#22) Sealed Document Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint For Administrative Review by Illinois State Board of Education . (Traynoff, Taylor) Modified on 8/27/2019 (trb). (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#21) MOTION for Leave to File Answer Under Seal by Illinois State Board of Education . (Traynoff, Taylor) Modified on 8/27/2019 (trb). (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Traynoff on behalf of Illinois State Board of Education (Traynoff, Taylor) Modified on 8/27/2019 (trb). (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Manning on behalf of Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187 (Manning, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#18) ORDER granting in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff indicates she has no objection to a continuance of thirty (30) days for Defendant to file its responsive pleading. As such, Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days in which to file its responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/22/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/22/2019)
  • 08/20/2019
  • (#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead filed by Antwynette Golliday. (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
  • 08/20/2019
  • (#16) ORDER: On 8/19/19, Defendant filed a motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Doc. 15). In its motion, Defendant requests a 60 day extension. to file a responsive pleading. The motion does not indicate whether Plaintiff objects to the motion. Therefore, to expedite this matter, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to respond to Defendant's motion (Doc. 15) by 8/23/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/20/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/20/2019)
  • 08/19/2019
  • (#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187. (Ohl, Donald) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
  • 08/19/2019
  • (#14) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187. (Ohl, Donald) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
  • 08/19/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Ohl on behalf of Board of Education of Cahokia Community Unit School District #187 (Ohl, Donald) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
  • 08/06/2019
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antwynette Golliday. Illinois State Board of Education served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.