This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2020 at 09:14:49 (UTC).

MEYERS vs. CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 MEYERS filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Colville. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01103

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Colville

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALICIA C. MEYERS

Defendant

CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter T. Kobylinski

Attorney at Praetorian Law Group, LLC

515 Court Place, Suite 4

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

David M. Kobylinski

Attorney at Praetorian Law Group, LLC

515 Court Place, Ste 3

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Philip K. Kontul

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

One Ppg Place, Suite 1900

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

#6

#5

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/17/20. (jg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Stipulated ESI Discovery Plan; The Joint Stipulated ESI Discovery Plan shall be filed by 9/15/20. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/8/20. (jg) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Stipulated ESI Discovery Plan by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Mediation by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. Mediation Date November 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The Honorable Kenneth J. Benson is appointed as mediator; The ADR conference(s) shall be concluded before 11/16/20 unless extended by order of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/27/20. (jg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend/Add Parties due by 10/26/20; The parties shall complete the ADR process they selected by 11/16/20. Discovery is not stayed pending ADR; Fact Discovery ends 1/25/21; Counsel must fax to 412-208-7309, or e-mail to Karen_Verminski@pawd.uscourts.gov updated confidential position letters by 2/3/21; A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 2/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in Suite 6220 before Judge Robert J. Colville. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/27/20. (jg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/27/20. (jg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/27/20 indicating that Orders to be entered; Parties shall file an Amended ADR Stipulation by 9/3/20; Parties shall file Joint Stipulated ESI Discovery Plan, or proposed ESI Discovery Plans by 9/8/20. (Court Reporter: None) (jg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 8/20/20; A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/27/20 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/30/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying Crown Castle USA Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Kontul, Philip) Modified on 7/30/2020 (jv). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and DEFENSES by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/24/20. (jg) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-002244 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number CPAWDC-5784211), filed by CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint from State Court, #3 Exhibit B) (jv) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN CASTLE INTERNATIONAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip K. Kontul