This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2021 at 08:09:42 (UTC).

MEYERS v. THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 MEYERS filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-17078

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORI MEYERS

Defendants

THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC.

ANTHEM, INC. doing business as ANTHEM BLUE CROSS & BLUE SHIELD

ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL S. ORLOW

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACI LAW, LLC

110 Marter Avenue, Suite 502

Moorestown, NJ 08057

Defendant Attorney

HOWARD MARK WEXLER

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

620 8Th Avenue, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC., ANTHEM, INC., THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MEYERS. THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MEYERS. ANTHEM, INC. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MEYERS. ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

(#6) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Attorney HOWARD MARK WEXLER for ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC.,HOWARD MARK WEXLER for ANTHEM, INC.,HOWARD MARK WEXLER for THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. added. (WEXLER, HOWARD) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Christine P. O'Hearn for all further proceedings. Judge Robert B. Kugler no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/12/2021. (dmw, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC., ANTHEM, INC., THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEXLER, HOWARD) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by ANTHEM, INC., THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC., ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/18/2021. (dmr) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Attorney HOWARD MARK WEXLER for ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC.,HOWARD MARK WEXLER for ANTHEM, INC.,HOWARD MARK WEXLER for THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. added. (WEXLER, HOWARD) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MEYERS. ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MEYERS. ANTHEM, INC. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LORI MEYERS. THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC., ANTHEM, INC., THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC., ANTHEM, INC., THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12807986) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LORI MEYERS.(ORLOW, DANIEL) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Anthem, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard M Wexler