This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2021 at 09:29:28 (UTC).

Meyers et al v. Wright Medical Technology Incorporated

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Meyers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01232

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence E Meyers

Dawn Burstyn-Meyers

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George E McLaughlin

Attorney at McLaughlin Law Firm PC

1890 Gaylord St.

Denver, CO 80206-1222

Steve H Patience

Attorney at Skousen Gulbrandsen & Patience PLC

414 E Southern Ave.

Mesa, AZ 85204-4993

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. T hat, unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 13, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/15/21. (MAW) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19666949. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01232-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19666949 filed by Lawrence E Meyers, Dawn Burstyn-Meyers.(Patience, Steve) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for George E McLaughlin on behalf of Plaintiffs Dawn Burstyn-Meyers, Lawrence E Meyers. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney George E McLaughlin terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. T hat, unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 13, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/15/21. (MAW) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19666949. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01232-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19666949 filed by Lawrence E Meyers, Dawn Burstyn-Meyers.(Patience, Steve) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George E. McLaughlin