This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:44:44 (UTC).

Meyer et al v. Raoul et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Meyer filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Raoul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID MEYER

FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.

SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION

EVA DAVIS

ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION

MITCHELL NALLEY

Defendants

KWAME RAOUL

BRENDAN KELLY

DWIGHT A. BAIRD

ERIC WEIS

RICHARD WATSON

JAMES GOMRIC

JOSHUA MORRISON

CHRISTOPHER PALMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian D. Ambler

Attorney at Stone & Johnson, Chtd.

111 West Washington Street, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60602

David G. Sigale

Attorney at Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.

430 West Roosevelt Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

David H. Thompson

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Peter A. Patterson

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

William V. Bergstrom

Attorney at Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

1523 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron P. Wenzloff

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office - Chicago 2

100 West Randolph Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60601

Isaac N. Freilich Jones

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office - Chicago 2

100 West Randolph Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60601

Laura K. Bautista

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office - Springfield

500 South Second Street

Springfield, IL 62701

Benjamin Jacobi

Attorney at O'Halloran, Kosoff, et al.

650 Dundee Road, Suite 475

Northbrook, IL 60062

Karen L. McNaught

Attorney at O'Halloran, Kosoff, et al.

650 Dundee Road, Suite 475

Northbrook, IL 60062

Thomas J Hunter

Attorney at Becker, Hoerner & Ysursa, P.C.

5111 West Main St.

Belleville, IL 62226

Thomas R. Ysursa

Attorney at Becker, Hoerner & Ysursa, P.C.

5111 West Main Street

Belleville, IL 62226

 

Court Documents

#48

47 #6

Exhibit Rogers v Hacker, 2021 WL 2711745

47 #5

Exhibit Stewart v Lakin, 2018 WL 1181312

47 #4

Exhibit Corbier v Watson, 2018 WL 4815391

47 #3

Exhibit Goodman v Carter, 2001 WL 755137

47 #2

Exhibit Hirschfeld v Bureau of Alcohol Firearms Tobacco And Explosives, 2021 WL

47 #1

Exhibit National Rifle Association of America Inc v Swearingen, 2021 WL 2592545

#47

#46

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

1 #3

Exhibit corporate disclosure statement

1 #2

Exhibit Entry of Appearance

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Pleading by Brendan Kelly. (Bautista, Laura) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dwight A. Baird, Joshua Morrison, Christopher Palmer, Eric Weis. Responses due by 9/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit National Rifle Association of America Inc v Swearingen, 2021 WL 2592545, #2 Exhibit Hirschfeld v Bureau of Alcohol Firearms Tobacco And Explosives, 2021 WL 2934468, #3 Exhibit Goodman v Carter, 2001 WL 755137, #4 Exhibit Corbier v Watson, 2018 WL 4815391, #5 Exhibit Stewart v Lakin, 2018 WL 1181312, #6 Exhibit Rogers v Hacker, 2021 WL 2711745)(Jacobi, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brendan Kelly served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, Defendant Kwame Raoul's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 12, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/14/21. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Bautista on behalf of Brendan Kelly (Bautista, Laura) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron P. Wenzloff on behalf of Brendan Kelly, Kwame Raoul (Wenzloff, Aaron) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac N. Freilich Jones on behalf of Brendan Kelly, Kwame Raoul (Freilich Jones, Isaac) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kwame Raoul. (Bautista, Laura) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Bautista on behalf of Kwame Raoul (Bautista, Laura) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Richard Watson and James Gomric seek an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Defendants Morrison, Weis, Palmer, and Baird requested and received a comparable extension on July 2, 2021. Defendants Watson and Gomric explain that they, too, require additional time to research Plaintiffs' claims and that they would like time to explore whether there are opportunities for the parties to submit joint briefs in an attempt to streamline the issues before the Court. For good cause shown, Defendants' motion for extension of time to file answer is GRANTED. Defendants Watson and Gomric shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by August 5, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/13/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Brendan Kelly and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Kwame Raoul and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/1/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Requested. (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian D. Ambler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by David Meyer, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, Mitchell Nalley, Eva Davis, Illinois State Rifle Association. Notice of Appearances and Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed as separate documents on the docket using the correct event. Notice of Appearance can be found under Civil->Other Filings->Notice of Appearance. The Corporate Disclosure event can be found under Civil->Other Filings->Other Documents. Filer will need to re-file the documents as two separate entries. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-518-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0754-4489957 (ack) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #3 Exhibit corporate disclosure statement)(Ambler, Christian) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Rifle Association is a litigant

Latest cases where FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas R. Ysursa