This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 09:33:03 (UTC).

Mey v. ADT, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Mey filed an Other lawsuit against ADT, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diana Mey

Defendants

ADT, Inc.

Safe Streets USA, LLC

Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward A. Broderick

Matthew P McCue

Jonathan R Marshall

John W. Barrett

Sharon F. Iskra

Defendant Attorney

Jacob A. Manning

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

RESTRICTED

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

10 #5

Proposed Order

10 #4

Exhibit 4

10 #3

Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

#9

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MOTION for Protective Order by Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Manning, Jacob) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey for Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests to PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc.. (Barrett, John) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DISCOVERY REQUESTS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, WITH REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION: the Court grants the #10 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/12/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Edward A. Broderick: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002609 (nmm) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Broderick by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Serve Discovery Requests Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, With Request for Expedited Consideration by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc. served on 11/4/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew McCue. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/3/2020. (nmm) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Matthew McCue: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002594 (nmm) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew P. McCue by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Diana Mey. Safe Streets USA, LLC waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Barrett, John) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Diana Mey. ADT, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Barrett, John) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney Edward A. Broderick and Matthew P. McCue. (nmm) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diana Mey. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3124470 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmm) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less