This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 10:01:26 (UTC).

Metzger v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Metzger filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell G. Vineyard and Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02566

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

M&T Bank Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger AS TO EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger AS TO M&T BANK CORPORATION (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ddm) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger AS TO M&T BANK CORPORATION (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger AS TO EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Funmilola Adetokurbon Metzger. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11892526) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&T BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Neil Armor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Berry