Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:59:25 (UTC).

Metlakatla Indian Community v. Dunleavy et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Metlakatla Indian Community filed an Other lawsuit against Dunleavy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joshua M. Kindred and John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joshua M. Kindred

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Metlakatla Indian Community

Defendants

Amanda Price

Doug Vincent-Lang

Michael J. Dunleavy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher G. Lundberg

Attorney at Haglund Kelley LLP

200 Sw Market Street, Ste. 1777

Portland, OR 97201

Joshua James Stellmon

Attorney at Haglund Kelley LLP

200 Sw Market Street, Ste. 1777

Portland, OR 97201

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey G. Pickett

Attorney at Attorney General's Office (Anch)

1031 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

Christopher F. Orman

Attorney at Alaska Department of Law

123 4Th Street, Suite 600

Juneau, AK 99801

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER Vacating State's September 30, 2020 Deadline. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/1/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#20

(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael J. Dunleavy, Amanda Price, Doug Vincent-Lang, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION to Vacate Unopposed Motion Vacating the September 30, 2020 Responsive Pleading Due Date by Michael J. Dunleavy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pickett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#18

(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Michael Dunleavy on 09/10/2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#17

(#17) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Doug Vincent-Lang on 09/11/2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amanda Price on 09/02/2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Michael J. Dunleavy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pickett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Metlakatla Indian Community re #1 Complaint (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

5 #3

Unissued Summons re Defendant Amanda Price, Commissioner of the Alaska

5 #2

Unissued Summons re Defendant Doug Vincent-Lang, Commissioner of the Alaska Dep

5 #1

Unissued Summons re Defendant Chief of the Attorney General's Offce

#5

(#5) Unissued summons re Defendant Attorney General of Alaska, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Chief of the Attorney General's Office, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Doug Vincent-Lang, Commissioner of the Alaska Department of Fish and Game, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Amanda Price, Commissioner of the Alaska)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua J. Stellmon. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2919050.) by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher Lundberg. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2919044.) by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#1

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Metlakatla Indian Community re #1 Complaint (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Vacating State's September 30, 2020 Deadline. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/1/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael J. Dunleavy, Amanda Price, Doug Vincent-Lang, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION to Vacate Unopposed Motion Vacating the September 30, 2020 Responsive Pleading Due Date by Michael J. Dunleavy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pickett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Michael Dunleavy on 09/10/2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Doug Vincent-Lang on 09/11/2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amanda Price on 09/02/2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint, at docket #14 , is hereby GRANTED. Response to complaint is due 9/30/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Michael J. Dunleavy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pickett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Pickett on behalf of All Defendants (Pickett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Pickett on behalf of All Defendants (Pickett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/28/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) TMB TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge John W. Sedwick for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 5:20-cv-00008-JWS. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) JMK TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 5:20-cv-00008-TMB. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Metlakatla Indian Community re #1 Complaint (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Michael J. Dunleavy, Attorney General of Alaska, Amanda Price, Doug Vincent-Lang. (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unissued summons re Defendant Attorney General of Alaska, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Chief of the Attorney General's Office, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Doug Vincent-Lang, Commissioner of the Alaska Department of Fish and Game, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Amanda Price, Commissioner of the Alaska)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Joshua J. Stellmon. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2919050.) by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher Lundberg. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2919044.) by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael J. Dunleavy, Amanda Price, Doug Vincent-Lang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2919037.), filed by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Lundberg, Christopher) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher G. Lundberg