This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2021 at 08:09:11 (UTC).

Michael Joseph Metcalf v. Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Michael Joseph Metcalf filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Yusen Logistics Americas Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05912

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Joseph Metcalf

Defendants

Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.

Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.

Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd. doing business as Yusen Logistics Group

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grant Joseph Savoy

Attorney at Solouki Savoy LLP

316 West 2Nd Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Shoham J. Solouki

Attorney at Solouki Savoy LLP

316 West 2Nd Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer S McGeorge

Attorney at Ford and Harrison LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Chammas

Attorney at Ford and Harrison LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff and Putative Class Michael Joseph Metcalf (Solouki, Shoham) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

12 #2

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER

12 #12

Main Document

11 #4

Proposed Order

11 #3

Declaration of Yoshikazu Hirano

11 #2

Declaration of Gerald Hofmann

11 #1

Declaration of Jennifer S. McGeorge

10 #1

Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd., identifying Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., NYK Group Americas Inc. (McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.. (McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff and Putative Class Michael Joseph Metcalf (Solouki, Shoham) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON: DEFENDANT YUSEN LOGISTICS (AMERICAS) INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS #10 ; YUSEN LOGISTICS CO. LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION AGAINST YUSEN LOGISTICS CO., LTD. PURSUANT TO RULE 11((4), AND (5), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT #11 ; and PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMANDACTION TO SUPERIOR COURT #12 held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to remand. The Court grants Yusen Japan's motion to dismiss on personal jurisdiction grounds and does not address the other issues raised therein. The Court grants YLA's motion to dismiss each of the claims asserted in the Complaint, with leave to amend, but denies that motion to the extent it seeks to either dismiss or strike Plaintiff's class-related allegations. Plaintiff will have until September 13, 2021 to file a First Amended Complaint. The scheduling conference set for September 9, 2021, is continued to September 30, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file an updated joint Rule 26(f) report by noon on September 27, 2021. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 08/30/2021 Motions Hearing #10 #11 #12 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Metcalf. (Solouki, Shoham) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 [Complaint, or in the Alternative, Strike Class Allegations] filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 [Against Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd. Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(2), (4), and (5), or in the Alternative, to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.. (McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Metcalf. (Solouki, Shoham) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Metcalf. (Solouki, Shoham) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer S. McGeorge, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Anelli, #3 Proposed Order)(McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Metcalf. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SHOHAM J. SOLOUKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO SUPERIOR COURT, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER) (Solouki, Shoham) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Chammas counsel for Defendants Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.. Adding Daniel B. Chammas as counsel of record for Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. and Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. and Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd.. (Attorney Daniel Chammas added to party Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Chammas added to party Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.(pty:dft))(Chammas, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Michael Joseph Metcalf in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/1/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd., identifying Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., NYK Group Americas Inc. (McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.. (McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV20512 Receipt No: ACACDC-31670987 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd., Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer S. McGeorge, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Summons, #4 Exhibit C- State Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D- State Notice of Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit E- State ADR Information Package, #7 Exhibit F- Yusen Ltd., Proof of Service, #8 Exhibit G- Yusen Americas Proof of Service, #9 Exhibit H- Final Judgment in Galvez) (Attorney Jennifer S McGeorge added to party Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S McGeorge added to party Yusen Logistics Co. Ltd.(pty:dft))(McGeorge, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS is a litigant