This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 06:36:05 (UTC).

METAx LLC v. Meta Platforms, Inc.

Case Summary

On July 19, 2022, METAx LLC (collectively, with all of its predecessors-in-interest, “Meta” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Dyan Finguerra-DuCharme and Nicholas G. Saady of Pryor Cashman LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc., f/k/a Facebook, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged trademark infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, with Judge Louis L. Stanton presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “Facebook has brazenly violated fundamental intellectual property rights enshrined in U.S. law to obliterate a small business, Meta.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “On October 28, 2021, Mark Zuckerberg announced that Facebook was changing its name to ‘Meta’ — to become the key global player in the industry involving experiential and immersive technologies and in the creator communities associated with that industry. In doing so, Facebook seized the META name and mark, under which Justin ‘JB’ Bolognino — a pioneer in the field of experiential and immersive technologies, and one of the initial guardians of the creator community — had the foresight to conduct business since 2010, when he founded Meta.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Despite its actual knowledge of Meta, and apparently believing that it could trample the rights of this small business with impunity, Facebook has deployed its almost limitless resources to saturate the marketplace with its infringing META mark. Meta stands no chance against the corporate goliath that is Facebook.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Shortly after Facebook’s rebrand, Meta contacted Facebook and identified its infringing conduct. Facebook responded by baselessly asserting that Facebook and Meta offered ‘drastically different goods and services’ — admitting that Meta offered ‘multi-sensory live experiences’ whereas Facebook was just a ‘social technology company.’”

Plaintiff then alleged, “For over eight months, Meta acted in good faith, including by providing Facebook with thousands of pages of information demonstrating Meta’s broad trademark rights and the identical nature of Meta’s and Facebook’s goods and services. But, consistent with Facebook’s ethos of ‘might makes right,’ Facebook doubled down on its efforts to overwhelm Meta in the marketplace.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Blatantly contradicting its assertions months earlier, Facebook is now doing exactly what Meta has done for more than a decade — including by conducting the same immersive experiences, at the same events and venues, and working with the same creators and same companies.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Meta has been crushed by Facebook’s flagrant, unlawful conduct. Meta can no longer provide goods and services under the META mark because consumers are likely to mistakenly believe that Meta’s goods and services emanate from Facebook and that Meta is associated with the toxicity that is inextricably linked with Facebook.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “Facebook has knowingly and willfully become a direct competitor of Meta with full knowledge of Meta’s reputation and the goodwill that Meta had built around the META Mark in the Industry.”

Plaintiff presented three claims for relief, including claims for the alleged federal trademark infringement and unfair competition under both federal and New York law. In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested permanent injunctive relief and declaratory relief along with an award for profits, damages, exemplary damages, costs, expenses, and reasonable attorneys’ fees.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06125

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis L. Stanton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METAx LLC

Defendant

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dyan Finguerra-DuCharme

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Felicity Sloan Kohn

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Robert J. deBrauwere

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Nicholas George Saady

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Dale Margaret Cendali

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Claudia Elizabeth Ray

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

153 East 53Rd Street

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Dale M. Cendali dated August 5, 2022. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#15

(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Elizabeth Ray on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dale Margaret Cendali on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent (Jenn Bautista). Document filed by METAx LLC..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felicity Sloan Kohn on behalf of METAx LLC..(Kohn, Felicity) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. deBrauwere on behalf of METAx LLC..(deBrauwere, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#9

(#9) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meta Platforms, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

1 #22

Exhibit V

1 #20

Exhibit T

1 #18

Exhibit R

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

26 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Dale M. Cendali dated August 5, 2022. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Elizabeth Ray on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dale Margaret Cendali on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent (Jenn Bautista). Document filed by METAx LLC..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felicity Sloan Kohn on behalf of METAx LLC..(Kohn, Felicity) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. deBrauwere on behalf of METAx LLC..(deBrauwere, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meta Platforms, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas George Saady. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Sullivan; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dyan Finguerra-DuCharme on behalf of METAx LLC..(Finguerra-DuCharme, Dyan) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas George Saady on behalf of METAx LLC..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by METAx LLC..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Meta Platforms, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by METAx LLC..(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26431443)Document filed by METAx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V).(Saady, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant