This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2020 at 07:49:59 (UTC).

MetalForming, Inc. v. New Tech Machinery Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 MetalForming, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against New Tech Machinery Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00403

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MetalForming, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

New Tech Machinery Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Christian Clayden

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP-Denver

1776 Lincoln Street, Suite 1100

Denver, CO 80203

Wesley Austin Roberts

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Andrea Nguyen Bonner

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Norman Andrew Crain

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

John Michael Skeriotis

Attorney at Emerson Thomson & Bennett LLC

1914 Akron Peninsula Road

Akron, OH 44313

 

Court Documents

#24

#21

20 #8

Exhibit H: US Patent No 7,703,208

20 #7

Exhibit G: AU Patent 2008203001

20 #6

Exhibit F: AU Patent 2004203534

20 #5

Exhibit E: US Patent No 6,272,447

20 #4

Exhibit D: Notice of Allowance

20 #1

Exhibit A: US Patent No 8,984,923

#20

#5

#4

#2

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the determination of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/10/20 re: #21 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case, filed by MetalForming, Inc.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall close this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/20, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#23) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 4/9/20. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff MetalForming, Inc.. (Crain, Norman) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against MetalForming, Inc. by Plaintiff MetalForming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Patent No 8,984,923, #2 Exhibit B: Response to Office Action dated Dec. 20, 2012, #3 Exhibit C: Response to Office Action dated July 25, 2013, #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E: US Patent No 6,272,447, #6 Exhibit F: AU Patent 2004203534, #7 Exhibit G: AU Patent 2008203001, #8 Exhibit H: US Patent No 7,703,208)(Skeriotis, John) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/25/20 DENYING as moot #18 Joint Motion to Attend Scheduling Conference Via Telephone.Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/12/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/20 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 5/19/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION for Order to Attend Scheduling Conference via Telephone by Defendant New Tech Machinery Corp.. (Skeriotis, John) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/23/20 DENYING as moot #13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mazzella Holding Company, Inc. for New Tech Machinery Corp.. (Skeriotis, John) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Tech Machinery Corp..(Skeriotis, John) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrea Nguyen Bonner on behalf of MetalForming, Inc.Attorney Andrea Nguyen Bonner added to party MetalForming, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bonner, Andrea) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wesley Austin Roberts on behalf of MetalForming, Inc.Attorney Wesley Austin Roberts added to party MetalForming, Inc.(pty:pla) (Roberts, Wesley) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Norman Andrew Crain on behalf of MetalForming, Inc.Attorney Norman Andrew Crain added to party MetalForming, Inc.(pty:pla) (Crain, Norman) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/9/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/16/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachent 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to New Tech Machinery Corp re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff MetalForming, Inc.. (Clayden, Alexander) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New Tech Machinery Corp. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7155769)Attorney Alexander Christian Clayden added to party MetalForming, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by MetalForming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Clayden, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MetalForming, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman Andrew Crain

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley A Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea Nguyen Bonner