This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 07:33:25 (UTC).

Meta Platforms, Inc. v. Does 1-100

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Meta Platforms, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Does 1-100. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-09797

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Instagram, LLC

WhatsApp LLC

Defendant

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104

Grant Michael Damon-Feng

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104

John Douglas Freed

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #14 Motion for Protective Order. The court can decide the issue without oral argument, N.D. Cal. Civ. L. R. 7-1(b), and approves the proposed protective order. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/12/2022)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Declaration of Bonnie MacNaughton

14 #14

Main Document

#12

(#12) Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-16735671 by Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC. (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#11

(#11) Order granting #5 Motion to Expedite entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.In the attached order, the court grants the motion for expedited discovery. (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 12/23/2021) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#9

(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Michael Damon-Feng (Damon-Feng, Grant) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas Freed (Freed, John) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

5 #3

Proposed Order

5 #2

Declaration of Bonnie MacNaughton in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery

5 #1

Declaration of Robert Flaim in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery

5 #5

Main Document

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #14 Motion for Protective Order. The court can decide the issue without oral argument, N.D. Cal. Civ. L. R. 7-1(b), and approves the proposed protective order. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/25/2022. Replies due by 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bonnie MacNaughton, #2 Proposed Order)(MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Refund Status re #12 Application for Refund Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-16735671 by Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC. (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order granting #5 Motion to Expedite entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.In the attached order, the court grants the motion for expedited discovery. (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 12/23/2021) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Michael Damon-Feng (Damon-Feng, Grant) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas Freed (Freed, John) (Filed on 12/21/2021) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Flaim in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, #2 Declaration of Bonnie MacNaughton in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, #3 Proposed Order) (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/20/2021) Modified on 12/22/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) FEE PAID (Filing fee$402,receipt number ACANDC-16736681). (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re:[ 1] Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC, Instagram, LLC (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/20/2021) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Does 1-100. Filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp LLC, Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MacNaughton, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/20/2021) Modified on 12/22/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WhatsApp Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Instagram, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Douglas Freed