This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 08:17:25 (UTC).

Messina v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Messina filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00739

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Christopher Messina

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations - PHV

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Clare Smith Millette

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Edderek Linnel Cole

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Thomas W. Tardy, III

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Charles (Chan) E. McLeod

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Letter sent to Howard L. Nations on 11/15/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan)) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09058. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/11/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than September 4, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 4, 2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7546370) filed by Chris Christopher Messina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Chris Christopher Messina(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Letter sent to Howard L. Nations on 11/15/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion by Defendants BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for these Defendants and terminated from the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/6/19 (HM) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan)) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09058. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/11/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than September 4, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 4, 2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7546370) filed by Chris Christopher Messina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Chris Christopher Messina(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.