This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2020 at 08:11:49 (UTC).

Messieh et al v. HDR Global Trading Limited et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Messieh filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against HDR Global Trading Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03232

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Drew Lee

Brett Messieh

Defendants

BEN DELO

HDR Global Trading Limited

SAMUEL REED

ARTHUR HAYES

ABS Global Trading Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philippe Zuard Selendy

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Jordan Ari Goldstein

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Joshua Scott Margolin

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Mitchell D. Nobel

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, New York

New York, NY 10104

Kyle William Roche

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

99 Park Avenue, Suite 1910

New York, NY 10016

Joseph Michael Delich

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

99 Park Avenue, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Edward John Normand

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

99 Park Avenue, Suite 1910

New York, NY 10016

Devin Freedman

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 5500

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah B. Zimmer

Attorney at Smith Villazor LLP

1700 Broadway, Suite 2801

New York, NY 10019

Patrick J. Smith

Attorney at Smith Villazor LLP

250 West 55Th Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Thomas Henry Sosnowski

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Harlan Andrew Levy

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Rebecca Rose Delfiner

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Todd Steven Fishman

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

David C. Esseks

Attorney at Allen & Overy, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Douglas Kent Yatter

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Hanyu Xie

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

James Joseph Benjamin, Jr

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP (NYC)

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Peter Ian Altman

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Rider

#2

#1

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hanyu Xie on behalf of Samuel Reed..(Xie, Hanyu) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Kent Yatter on behalf of Samuel Reed..(Yatter, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Ian Altman on behalf of Arthur Hayes..(Altman, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Henry Sosnowski on behalf of Ben Delo..(Sosnowski, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah B. Zimmer on behalf of Ben Delo..(Zimmer, Sarah) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Smith on behalf of Ben Delo..(Smith, Patrick) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Joseph Benjamin, Jr on behalf of Arthur Hayes..(Benjamin, James) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harlan Andrew Levy on behalf of Ben Delo..(Levy, Harlan) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER:IT IS ACCORDINGLY STIPULATED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the Parties, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. The undersigned counsel for Defendants hereby waive service on behalf of all Defendants of the summons and Initial Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d), without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 2. Defendants shall have no obligation to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Initial Complaint, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. 3. Subject to the Court's Individual Practices and any Court order, Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint within 60 days after the later of (i) the entry of the Courts order. appointing interim class counsel, (ii) Lead Plaintiffs' decision to proceed on the basis of the Initial Complaint or to file an amended class action complaint and the filing of such amended class action complaint, and (iii) the Courts ruling on any motion by Defendants to seek coordination and/or consolidation of this action with the related case against the same Defendants pending before this Court, Williams v. HDR Global Trading Limited et al., Case No. 1:20-cv-02805-ALC. 4. If Defendants move to dismiss the operative complaint, Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss within 45 days after the filing of the motion, and Defendants shall file any reply within 30 days after the filing of the opposition to the motion to dismiss. 5. Nothing in this stipulation shall constitute the Defendants' written consent to, or Court approval of, the filing by Plaintiffs of any amended complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a), and the Parties respectively reserve their rights thereunder. 6. The Defendants reserve their right to seek coordination and/or consolidation with the related case against the same Defendants pending before this Court, Williams v. HDR Global Trading Limited et al., Case No. 1:20-cv-02805-ALC, to which Plaintiffs reserve their right to oppose. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/4/2020) (rj) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER APPOINTING ROCHE CYRULNIK FREEDMAN AND SELENDY & GAY AS INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 23(g): granting #20 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP and Selendy & Gay PLLC as Interim Class Counsel pursuant to Rule 23(g)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is GRANTED. This Order shall apply to each class action pending or subsequently filed in or transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York raising similar claims not subject to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, 15 U.S.C. 77z-1, 78u-4. And as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/04/2020) (ama) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell D. Nobel on behalf of Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Nobel, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Ari Goldstein on behalf of Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Goldstein, Jordan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SAMUEL REED, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BEN DELO, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ARTHUR HAYES, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ABS GLOBAL TRADING LIMITED, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HDR GLOBAL TRADING LIMITED, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-02805-ALC. Document filed by Drew Lee, Brett Messieh..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rider).(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ABS Global Trading Limited, BEN DELO, ARTHUR HAYES, HDR Global Trading Limited, SAMUEL REED. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19566252)Document filed by Brett Messieh, Drew Lee..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS GLOBAL TRADING LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where HDR GLOBAL TRADING LIMITED DBA BITMEX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Scott Margolin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell D. Nobel