This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 09:53:49 (UTC).

Messer v. Network Transport, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Messer filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Network Transport, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles E Atchley, Jr and Susan K Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles E Atchley, Jr

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clint Messer

Defendants

Network Transport, LLC

American Logistics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank P Pinchak

H. Eric Burnette

Defendant Attorneys

Lincoln W. Hobbs

Charles D Lawson

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Summons Issued as to American Logistics, Inc.

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons for American Logistics, Inc.

1 #2

Summons for Network Transport, LLC

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Network Transport, LLC. (Hobbs, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lawson, Charles) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lincoln W. Hobbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants American Logistics, Inc., Network Transport, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 09/04/2021. (KRS) Mailed to Hobbs(CNC). (Entered: 09/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Network Transport, LLC, American Logistics, Inc. (AML) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave for Lincoln Hobbs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt No. C1018553) by American Logistics, Inc., Network Transport, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2021 01:00 PM (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr. on 8/26/2021. (AML) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Network Transport and American Logistics ANSWER to Complaint by Messer, Clint by Network Transport, LLC.(Lawson, Charles) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by All Defendants. (Lawson, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clint Messer(Individually). American Logistics, Inc. served on 7/24/2021. (Pinchak, Frank) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clint Messer(Individually). Network Transport, LLC served on 7/22/2021. (Pinchak, Frank) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Network Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to American Logistics, Inc.)(AML) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 7/19/2021. (AML) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 7/19/2021. (AML) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 7/19/2021. (AML) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021

DocketDistrict Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT -- COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4790131.), filed by Clint Messer. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Network Transport, LLC, #3 Summons for American Logistics, Inc.)(Pinchak, Frank) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less