This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:27:06 (UTC).

Mesa View Family Church v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Mesa View Family Church filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W. Skavdahl and Mark L. Carman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00469

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W. Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Mark L. Carman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mesa View Family Church

Defendants

Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company

Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M Houliston

Attorney at The Law Offices of David M Houliston

7500 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 106

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Keith E Patton

Attorney at Patton Law, P.C.

P.O. Box 25864

Albuquerque, NM 87125

Defendant Attorney

Courtenay L Keller

Attorney at Riley Shane Keller PA

3880 Osuna Road Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC (Keller, Courtenay) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (bap). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E Patton on behalf of Mesa View Family Church (Patton, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing:Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman set for 7/13/2020 at 03:00 PM. Connect to the Court at (888) 398-2342; Access Code: 6705030; Security Code: 2533. (kew) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC. (Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#2

(#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company from State of New Mexico Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2020-00287. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC (Keller, Courtenay) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (bap). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E Patton on behalf of Mesa View Family Church (Patton, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing:Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman set for 7/13/2020 at 03:00 PM. Connect to the Court at (888) 398-2342; Access Code: 6705030; Security Code: 2533. (kew) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, LLC. (Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl and United States Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman assigned. (dr) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7124096 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company from State of New Mexico Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2020-00287. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Keller, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtenay L Keller(Designation Retained)