This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:23:30 (UTC).

Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company v. Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Whitfield Breitigam Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00580

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al.

Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC doing business as End Zone Sports Bar & Grill

William Whitfield

Angela Trevino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen A Melendi

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Ball Mitchell, LLP

2811 Mckinney Ave, Ste 250 W

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Stephen Beik

Attorney at Beik Law Firm PLLC

8100 Washington Ave, Ste 1000

Houston, TX 77007

Jordan Andrew Glaze

Attorney at Glaze Garrett

Po Box 1599, Gilmer

Gilmer, TX 75644

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al., filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al., filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al., filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltien, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Summons

6 #2

Summons

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William Whitfield served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#9

(#9) RETURN of Service, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by William Whitfield, Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC, filed.(Beik, Paul) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#13) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela Trevino, filed.(Glaze, Jordan) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angela Trevino, filed.(Glaze, Jordan) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Angela Trevino, filed.(Glaze, Jordan) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketThe above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by William Whitfield, Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC, filed.(Beik, Paul) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William Whitfield served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Angela Trevino, William Whitfield, Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltien, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al., filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al., filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al., filed.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Whitfield & Breitigam Enterprises LLC d/b/a End Zone Sports Bar & Grill, et al. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27785938) filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Andrew Glaze

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Stephen Beik