This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2021 at 13:46:31 (UTC).

Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company v. Khamlai Lodging, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Khamlai Lodging, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02474

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Red Roof Inns, Inc.

N.R.

R.I.

Khamlai Lodging, LLC

Khamlai Management, LLC

Red Roof Franchising, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan R. Miles

Attorney at Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP

3343 Peachtree Road, Ne, 1600 Atlanta Financial Center

Atlanta, GA 30326

Ryan Chorkey Burke

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Seslee S. Smith

Attorney at Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Incorrect Summons - R.I.

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit -D

1 #3

Exhibit -C

1 #2

Exhibit -B

1 #1

Exhibit -A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. Khamlai Lodging, LLC waiver mailed on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021; Khamlai Management, LLC waiver mailed on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return of Service Executed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. Red Roof Inns, Inc. served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. Red Roof Franchising, LLC served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Patrick McDonough and Jonathan Tonge on 6/21/2021., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. N.R. waiver mailed on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021; R.I. waiver mailed on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Smith, Seslee) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliates: BlackRock, Inc. and Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (eop) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to R.I.. (eop) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to N.R.. (eop) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Roof Franchising, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Khamlai Management, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Khamlai Lodging, LLC. (eop) Modified on 6/18/2021 to correct date issued (eop). (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11048146) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Incorrect Summons - R.I.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RI Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where N.R. is a litigant

Latest cases where Red Roof Franchising, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RED ROOF INNS INC is a litigant