This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 13:11:49 (UTC).

Mesa Robotics, Inc v. Developers Surety And Indemnity Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Mesa Robotics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Developers Surety And Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mesa Robotics, Inc

Mesa Robotics, Inc Doing business as Mesa Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

HS Construction And Excavating, LLC

Developers Surety And Indemnity Company

The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew W Stiles

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC (Birmingham)

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Regions Harbert Plaza, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

W Brad English

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC (Huntsville)

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

Robert G Jones

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC (Huntsville)

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

 

Court Documents

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Summons HS Construction and Excavating

#3

#2

1 #9

Summons Summons to HS Construction

1 #8

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Other Rule 7.1 Disclosure

1 #6

Summons Summons to Ohio Casualty

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D Correspondence to Surety

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C Correspondence to Contractor

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B HS Purchase Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A Payment Bond

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Mesa Robotics, Inc (Jones, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/26/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 6/29/2020 to indicate c/m to Robert G Jones Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC (Huntsville), 655 Gallatin Street, Huntsville, AL 35801 (ABF). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Mesa Robotics, Inc, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Mesa Robotics, Inc (ABF) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3040534.) by Mesa Robotics, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3040534.) by Mesa Robotics, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $400.00, receipt number K3040507. (JBR) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Attorney will be mailing a check in the amount of $400 for the filing fee. (ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/19/20. (ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/19/20. (ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/19/20. (ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Developers Surety And Indemnity Company, HS Construction And Excavating, LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ohio Casualty Insurance Co, #2 Summons HS Construction and Excavating)(ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel Matthew Stiles re #1 Complaint, : Requirements due by 6/24/2020. No payment submitted, Amount DUE: $400.00(ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Mesa Robotics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit Ex. B HS Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Correspondence to Contractor, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Correspondence to Surety, #5 Summons Summons to Developers Surety, #6 Summons Summons to Ohio Casualty, #7 Other Rule 7.1 Disclosure, #8 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summons to HS Construction)(Stiles, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Stiles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Goodwin Jones