This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2021 at 07:37:32 (UTC).

Mesa Public Schools v. JUUL Labs Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Mesa Public Schools filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against JUUL Labs Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05800

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mesa Public Schools

Defendants

Juul Labs Incorporated

Altria Group Incorporated

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Philip Morris USA Incorporated

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean Kawamoto

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP - Seattle, WA

1201 3Rd Ave., Ste. 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3276

Derek W. Loeser

Attorney at Keller Rohrback, L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Felicia Craick

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Joel Grant Woods

Attorney at Grant Woods PC

Two Renaissance Square, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 2250

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Lynn Lincoln Sarko

Attorney at Keller Rohrback L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Ron Kilgard

Attorney at Keller Rohrback, P.L.C.

3101 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1400

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2646

 

Court Documents

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:21-cv-01247. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) Transferring Case to Northern District of California Re MDL-2913. (MAP) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#5

(#5) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 15, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/21/21. (MAW) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to JUUL Labs Incorporated, Altria Group Incorporated, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Philip Morris USA Incorporated, James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, and Nicholas Pritzker. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19674137. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1247-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron) (MYE) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19674137 filed by Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Arizona, 2:21-cv-01247, Mesa Public Schools v. Juul Labs Incorporated et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05800-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 68 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:21-cv-01247. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) Transferring Case to Northern District of California Re MDL-2913. (MAP) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 15, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/21/21. (MAW) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to JUUL Labs Incorporated, Altria Group Incorporated, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Philip Morris USA Incorporated, James Monsees, Adam Bowen, Hoyoung Huh, Riaz Valani, and Nicholas Pritzker. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19674137. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1247-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron) (MYE) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19674137 filed by Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Altria Client Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant