This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 13:01:46 (UTC).

Mesa Digital, LLC v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Mesa Digital, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Pauley, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03957

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Pauley, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mesa Digital, LLC

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew M. Wawrzyn

Attorney at Wawrzyn & Jarvis LLC

2700 Patriot Blvd, Suite 250

Glenview, IL 60026

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #4 Motion for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/13/2019) (tro) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#7

(#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC.(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

4 #3

Text of Proposed Order

4 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

4 #1

Declaration of Matthew M. Wawrzyn

#4

(#4) MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16810761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Wawrzyn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#3

(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16810655)Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #4 Motion for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/13/2019) (tro) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/13/2019) (tro) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew M. Wawrzyn. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 35:271. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1400. (dnh) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16810761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC.(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16810761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Wawrzyn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16810655)Document filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mesa Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew M. Wawrzyn