This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2022 at 23:14:39 (UTC).

MESA DIGITAL, LLC v. Kyocera International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MESA DIGITAL, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kyocera International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01019

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA DIGITAL, LLC

Defendant

Kyocera International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Jose L. Patino

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Ian Scott Shelton

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Justin Edwin Gray

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Nicola A. Pisano

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kyocera International, Inc., re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Gray, Justin) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

15 #1

Proposed Order Order

#15

(#15) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Extension to Respond by MESA DIGITAL, LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement (Ramey, William) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin Edwin Gray. Attorney added for Kyocera International, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicola A. Pisano. Attorney added for Kyocera International, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jose L. Patino. Attorney added for Kyocera International, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order for Justin Edwin Gray

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Justin Edwin Gray ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15400164) by on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Justin Edwin Gray)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order for Nicola A. Pisano

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Nicola A. Pisano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15400036) by on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Nicola A. Pisano)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order for Jose L. Patino

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Jose L. Patino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15399886) by on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Jose L. Patino)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kyocera International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kyocera Corporation (of Japan) for Kyocera International, Inc.. (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by Kyocera International, Inc.. (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#4

#3

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kyocera International, Inc., re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Gray, Justin) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Defendant Kyocera International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Extension to Respond by MESA DIGITAL, LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement (Ramey, William) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin Edwin Gray. Attorney added for Kyocera International, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicola A. Pisano. Attorney added for Kyocera International, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jose L. Patino. Attorney added for Kyocera International, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Justin Edwin Gray ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15400164) by on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Justin Edwin Gray)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Nicola A. Pisano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15400036) by on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Nicola A. Pisano)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Jose L. Patino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15399886) by on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Jose L. Patino)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kyocera International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kyocera Corporation (of Japan) for Kyocera International, Inc.. (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by Kyocera International, Inc.. (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Kyocera International, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15289926), filed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US9031537, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mesa Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Scott Shelton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Edwin Gray