This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2021 at 08:11:37 (UTC).

MESA DIGITAL, LLC v. Cellco Partnership

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MESA DIGITAL, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01020

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA DIGITAL, LLC

Defendant

Cellco Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit US9031537

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. Cellco Partnership served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Cellco Partnership. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by Cellco Partnership (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Cellco Partnership answer due 12/28/2021. (ir) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE by Cellco Partnership (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Cellco Partnership. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. Cellco Partnership served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15290132), filed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US9031537, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mesa Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith