This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2022 at 18:01:35 (UTC).

MESA DIGITAL, LLC v. Best Buy Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On October 5, 2021, Mesa Digital, LLC (“Mesa” or “Plaintiff”), represented by William P. Ramey, III of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Best Buy Co., Inc. (“Best Buy” or Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages along with prejudgment and post-judgment interests among other relief for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by Plaintiff. The case was filed in the United State District Court in the Western District of Texas.

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 9,031,537 (“the ‘537 patent”) entitled “Electronic wireless hand held multimedia device” (referred to as the “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “The ‘537 patent relates to a novel and improved electronic wireless hand held multimedia devices including a microprocessor and more than one wireless transceiver modules enabling wireless communications over a variety of standards” and “Defendant maintains, operates, manufactures, sells, offers for sale, and imports electronic wireless hand held multimedia devices including a microprocessor and more than one wireless transceiver modules enabling wireless communications over a variety of standards.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant has and continues to induce infringement. Defendant has actively encouraged or instructed others (e.g., its customers and/or the customers of its related companies), and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services (e.g., discovering and presenting information in text content with different view formats) such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–37 of the ‘537 patent, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Moreover, Defendant has known of the ‘537 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of the filing of the lawsuit.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant has and continues to contributorily infringe. Defendant has actively encouraged or instructed others (e.g., its customers and/or the customers of its related companies), and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services (e.g., discovering and presenting information in text content with different view formats) and related services such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–37 of the ‘537 patent, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Moreover, Defendant has known of the ‘537 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of the filing of the lawsuit” and “Defendant has caused and will continue to cause MESA damage by direct and indirect infringement of (including inducing infringement of) the claims of the ‘537 patent.”

There is one claim of relief laid down by Plaintiff for the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court for injunctive relief and an award of damages in an amount sufficient to compensate it for Defendant’s infringement of the ‘537 patent in an amount no less than a reasonable royalty or lost profits, together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs under 35 U.S.C.§ 284, and accounting for acts of infringement along with treble damages, attorneys’ fees, expenses, and costs and any other relief the court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01038

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA DIGITAL, LLC

Defendant

Best Buy Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Bullitt Group Ltd.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#24

(#24) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bullitt Group Ltd.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#23

(#23) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Best Buy Co., Inc..(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss The Bullitt Group, Ltd. by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

15 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

15 #1

Exhibit US9031537

#15

(#22) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Best Buy Co., Inc..(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Extension to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by MESA DIGITAL, LLC re #1 Complaint (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit US9031537

#1

19 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Bullitt Group Ltd.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bullitt Group Ltd.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Best Buy Co., Inc..(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner added to party Bullitt Group Ltd.(pty:dft) by Bullitt Group Ltd..(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE For UNOPPOSED Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss The Bullitt Group, Ltd. by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Ramey, William) Summons will not issue (lad). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Best Buy Co., Inc. answer due 12/10/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Extension to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by MESA DIGITAL, LLC re #1 Complaint (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15300503), filed by MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US9031537, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mesa Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Best Buy Co. Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III