This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:09:23 (UTC).

Mesa Digital LLC v. Acer America Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Mesa Digital LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Acer America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alex G. Tse and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02337

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Alex G. Tse

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mesa Digital LLC

Defendant

Acer America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Christopher Atkins

Attorney at Atkins &Davidson, APC

2261 Rutherford Road

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Matthew Michael Wawrzyn

Attorney at Wawrzyn LLC

2700 Patriot Boulevard, Suite 250

Glenview, IL 60026

Defendant Attorneys

Jerry Chen

Attorney at Technowledge Law Group LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94065

Kevin Christopher Jones

Attorney at TechKnowledge Law Group LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Craig R. Kaufman

Attorney at TechKnowledge Law Group LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Kaiwen Tseng

Attorney at TechKnowledge Law Group LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#21

#19

#18

#17

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAcer America Corporation. (Chen, Jerry) (Filed on 6/4/2020) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Chen (Chen, Jerry) (Filed on 6/4/2020) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/13/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Acer America Corporation.. (Tseng, Kaiwen) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mesa Digital LLC.. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #10 Stipulated Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by Acer America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Acer Inc. for Acer America Corporation. (Tseng, Kaiwen) (Filed on 5/4/2020) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Christopher Jones (Jones, Kevin) (Filed on 5/4/2020) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tseng, Kaiwen) (Filed on 5/4/2020) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/14/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mesa Digital LLC (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/13/2020) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mesa Digital LLC (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/13/2020) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Acer America Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/7/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Jury Trial Demanded against Acer America Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14348946.). Filed by Mesa Digital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/7/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mesa Digital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACER AMERICA CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION C/O FRONTIER LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaiwen Tseng

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig R. Kaufman