This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 08:33:03 (UTC).

MERSCHAT v. SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 MERSCHAT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01835

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMARA MERSCHAT

Defendant

SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan L. Strassburger

Defendant Attorneys

Mark T. Phillis

Morgan Dull

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. The deadline to file an amended complaint is now 2/25/2022. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/17/2022. (nt) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #12 Case Management Order by TAMARA MERSCHAT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Strassburger, Jordan) Modified text on 2/18/2022. (cel) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Dull on behalf of SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Dull, Morgan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#13

(#13) Notice of Initial ADR Conference by MARK D. SHEPARD. Initial ADR Conference Date 2/22/22, 9 am virtually via Zoom (Shepard, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 2/1/2022; Motions to Amend due by 2/17/2022. Motions to Join Additional Parties due by 2/17/2022 Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/16/2022. Parties shall meet and confer and file Joint Discovery Status reports by 2/28/2022 and 4/28/2022. Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 7/17/2022; Defendant Expert Reports due by 7/17/2022; Expert Depositions to be completed by 7/17/2022; Telephone Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/2022. (cw) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mark Shepard is appointed as mediator. Party MARK D. SHEPARD added. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/2022. (cw) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry Telephone Case Management Conference held before Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/2022. Mediation is scheduled for 3/10/22. Mark Phillis was appointed lead counsel and shall file a notice with the Court advising of any changes to the date, time and location of the ADR session, as well as the principals from each party who will be in attendance at the ADR session (Court Reporter: none) (cw) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/12/2022. (cw) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

6 #2

2: Rule 26(f) form

6 #1

1: Stipulation Selecting ADR

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 1/18/2022 at at 2:00 PM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Report due by 1/11/2022. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/23/21. (Attachments: #1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR, #2 2: Rule 26(f) form) (cjo) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/22/21. (cjo) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. The deadline to file an amended complaint is now 2/25/2022. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 2/17/2022. (nt) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #12 Case Management Order by TAMARA MERSCHAT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Strassburger, Jordan) Modified text on 2/18/2022. (cel) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Dull on behalf of SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Dull, Morgan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Notice of Initial ADR Conference by MARK D. SHEPARD. Initial ADR Conference Date 2/22/22, 9 am virtually via Zoom (Shepard, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 2/1/2022; Motions to Amend due by 2/17/2022. Motions to Join Additional Parties due by 2/17/2022 Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/16/2022. Parties shall meet and confer and file Joint Discovery Status reports by 2/28/2022 and 4/28/2022. Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 7/17/2022; Defendant Expert Reports due by 7/17/2022; Expert Depositions to be completed by 7/17/2022; Telephone Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/2022. (cw) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mark Shepard is appointed as mediator. Party MARK D. SHEPARD added. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/2022. (cw) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Minute Entry Telephone Case Management Conference held before Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/18/2022. Mediation is scheduled for 3/10/22. Mark Phillis was appointed lead counsel and shall file a notice with the Court advising of any changes to the date, time and location of the ADR session, as well as the principals from each party who will be in attendance at the ADR session (Court Reporter: none) (cw) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/12/2022. (cw) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 1/18/2022 at at 2:00 PM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Report due by 1/11/2022. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/23/21. (Attachments: #1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR, #2 2: Rule 26(f) form) (cjo) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement identifying Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Phillis, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/22/21. (cjo) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-21-013912 with Copies attached: Original Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6863944), filed by SIEMENS HEALTHINEERS. (Attachments: #1 Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less