This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2022 at 08:18:47 (UTC).

Merriweather v. Thrive Restaurant Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2022 Merriweather filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Thrive Restaurant Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00538

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Merriweather

Defendants

Thrive Restaurant Group, LLC

Applebee's Restaurants LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

J. Russ Bryant

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Robert E. Turner, IV

Attorney at Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (Memphis)

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - Kenneth Merriweather Consent to Join

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to Applebee's Restaurants LLC and Thrive Restaurant Group, LLC. (Service copies sent to counsel by regular mail.) (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Kenneth Merriweather. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for continuance (Docket Entry No. #7 ) is GRANTED and the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from September 7, 2022, to 12:00 noon, Wednesday, November 16, 2022, by telephone conference using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Defendants and/or otherwise ensure they are aware of the rescheduled date and time of the initial case management conference. The stay of discovery imposed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 remains in place, subject to any agreement of the parties otherwise or any party moving for the stay to be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketReset Hearings: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/16/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (hb) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for continuance (Docket Entry No. #7 ) is GRANTED and the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from September 7, 2022, to 12:00 noon, Wednesday, November 16, 2022, by telephone conference using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Defendants and/or otherwise ensure they are aware of the rescheduled date and time of the initial case management conference. The stay of discovery imposed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 remains in place, subject to any agreement of the parties otherwise or any party moving for the stay to be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/6/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Kenneth Merriweather. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Applebee's Restaurants LLC and Thrive Restaurant Group, LLC. (Service copies sent to counsel by regular mail.) (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon E. Jackson, J. Russ Bryant, Robert E. Turner, IV, and Robert E. Morelli, III admitted to this court. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Applebee's Restaurants LLC, Thrive Restaurant Group, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3629877), filed by Kenneth Merriweather. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Kenneth Merriweather Consent to Join)(jm) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Applebee's Restaurants LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Russ Bryant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gordon E. Jackson