This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:56:38 (UTC).

Merritt v. Casler et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Merritt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Casler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00568

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Merritt, Jr.

Defendants

Fort Transfer Company

John Does 1-5

Anthony Casler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John B. (Ben) Rowley

Attorney at HONEA LAW FIRM, PLLC

209 Apache Drive

Mccomb, MS 39648

Defendant Attorneys

Drury Sumner Holland

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Gulfport

2602 13Th Street, Suite 300

Gulfport, MS 39501

Scott Timothy Ellzey

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Gulfport

2602 13Th Street, Suite 300

Gulfport, MS 39501

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fort Transfer Company (Holland, Drury) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Merritt, Jr. Fort Transfer Company served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Rowley, John) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company (Holland, Drury) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company.(Ellzey, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#3

(#3) **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BRAD E KAHLER, Registered Agent for Fort Transfer Company on 09/23/2020, filed by Richard Merritt, Jr. (Rowley, John) Modified on 10/5/2020 (PKM). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company. (PG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, against Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4355867), filed by Richard Merritt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fort Transfer Company (Holland, Drury) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Merritt, Jr. Fort Transfer Company served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Rowley, John) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company (Holland, Drury) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company.(Ellzey, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Summons Returned Executed. Also, a return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile choosing the correct event and including both pages of the Summons as the pdf document. (PKM) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **ERROR** Disregard this entry. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BRAD E KAHLER, Registered Agent for Fort Transfer Company on 09/23/2020, filed by Richard Merritt, Jr. (Rowley, John) Modified on 10/5/2020 (PKM). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company. (PG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, against Anthony Casler, Fort Transfer Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4355867), filed by Richard Merritt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less