This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2019 at 07:35:45 (UTC).

Merrill v. Copeland

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Merrill filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Copeland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01240

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Merrill

Defendant

Corrine L. Copeland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael H. Sussman

Attorney at Sussman, Watkins Law Firm

1 Railroad Avenue, P.O. Box 1005

Goshen, NY 10924

Defendant Attorney

William A. Scott

Attorney at New York State Attorney General - Albany

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Letter Motion from William A. Scott for Corrine L. Copeland requesting Extension of Time to Appear submitted to Judge Lovric . (Scott, William) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corrine L. Copeland on 10/11/19, filed by Heather Merrill. (Sussman, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 1:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Corrine L. Copeland. (pjh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Corrine L. Copeland (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4899489) filed by Heather Merrill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • TEXT NOTICE: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 1:30 PM is RESCHEDULED for 1/29/2020 at 10:00 am at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. ALL RULE 16's ARE IN PERSON AND APPERANCES ARE REQUIRED.Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #5 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended and shall be due by 12/31/2019. Furthermore, the In Person Rule 16 conference is adjourned to 1/29/2020 and a separate Text Notice will be issued. Parties are advised that the Rule 16 conference is conducted IN PERSON by this Court and appearances are required. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2019. (jdp ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter Motion from William A. Scott for Corrine L. Copeland requesting Extension of Time to Appear submitted to Judge Lovric . (Scott, William) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • ***Answer deadline set for Corrine L. Copeland to 11/1/2019. (jmb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Corrine L. Copeland on 10/11/19, filed by Heather Merrill. (Sussman, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 1:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Corrine L. Copeland. (pjh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Corrine L. Copeland (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4899489) filed by Heather Merrill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William A. Scott