This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 12:55:58 (UTC).

MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL et al v. BECERRA

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against BECERRA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01397

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Donald H Romano

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

3000 K Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20007

Johnny Hillary Walker, III

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 4Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #5

Exhibit C

7 #4

Exhibit B

7 #3

Exhibit A

7 #2

Index of Exhibits

7 #1

Redline from Original Pleading

7 #7

Main Document

#6

#5

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Certified List of the Contents) by XAVIER BECERRA. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by XAVIER BECERRA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 09:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 28, 2021, the defendant shall file (1) the administrative record, pursuant to this Court's #6 General Order for Civil Cases Before the Honorable Reggie B. Walton; and (2) his motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, on or before August 27, 2021, the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, on or before September 17, 2021, the defendant shall file his reply in further support of his motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, on December 17, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the Court's resolution of the defendant's motion to dismiss. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the defendant's motion by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald H Romano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Romano, Donald) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint) by XAVIER BECERRA. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA filed by LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY HOSPITAL, SANTA MARTA HOSPITAL, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE, DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL, SEQUOIA HOSPITAL, LAPALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EMANATE HEALTH INTER-COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MERCY AMERICAN RIVER HOSPITAL, MEMORIALCARE ORANGE COAST MEDICAL CENTER, PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-WHITTIER, DANIEL FREEMAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, MERCY MT. SHASTA HOSPITAL, GLENDALE MEM HOSPITAL & HLTH CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- VAN NESS CAMPUS, ADVENTIST HEALTH LODI MEMORIAL, LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SACRAMENTO, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCED DOMINICAN, DANIEL FREEMAN MARINA HOSPITAL, ROBERT F. KENNEDY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER, MARTIN LUTHER HOSPITAL, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MARIAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNADINO, MERCY HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CTR- DAVIES CAMPUS HOSP, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING, MILLS-PENINSULA MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER LA, MARK TWAIN HOSPITAL, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LONG BEACH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL, SHERMAN WAY, MEMORIALCARE SADDLEBACK MEDICAL CENTER, EDEN MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL OF FOLSOM, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Redline from Original Pleading, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 1, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 5/27/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/27/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/26/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/27/2021. (Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ADVENTIST HEALTH LODI MEMORIAL, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER LA, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- VAN NESS CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CTR- DAVIES CAMPUS HOSP, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNADINO, DANIEL FREEMAN MARINA HOSPITAL, DANIEL FREEMAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, EDEN MEDICAL CENTER, EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, EMANATE HEALTH INTER-COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE MEM HOSPITAL & HLTH CENTER, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAPALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LONG BEACH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, MARIAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MARK TWAIN HOSPITAL, MARTIN LUTHER HOSPITAL, MEMORIALCARE ORANGE COAST MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIALCARE SADDLEBACK MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY AMERICAN RIVER HOSPITAL, MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF FOLSOM, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCED DOMINICAN, MERCY MT. SHASTA HOSPITAL, MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SACRAMENTO, MILLS-PENINSULA MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL, SHERMAN WAY, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-WHITTIER, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY HOSPITAL, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE, ROBERT F. KENNEDY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, SANTA MARTA HOSPITAL, SEQUOIA HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 1:16-cv-99. (Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADVENTIST HEALTH LODI MEMORIAL, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER LA, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- VAN NESS CAMPUS, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CTR- DAVIES CAMPUS HOSP, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNADINO, DANIEL FREEMAN MARINA HOSPITAL, DANIEL FREEMAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, EDEN MEDICAL CENTER, EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, EMANATE HEALTH INTER-COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE MEM HOSPITAL & HLTH CENTER, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAPALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LONG BEACH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, MARIAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MARK TWAIN HOSPITAL, MARTIN LUTHER HOSPITAL, MEMORIALCARE ORANGE COAST MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIALCARE SADDLEBACK MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY AMERICAN RIVER HOSPITAL, MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OF FOLSOM, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCED DOMINICAN, MERCY MT. SHASTA HOSPITAL, MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SACRAMENTO, MILLS-PENINSULA MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL, SHERMAN WAY, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-WHITTIER, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY HOSPITAL, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE, ROBERT F. KENNEDY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, SANTA MARTA HOSPITAL, SEQUOIA HOSPITAL (Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8469380) filed by LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, QUEEN OF THE VALLEY HOSPITAL, SANTA MARTA HOSPITAL, SANTA BARBARA COTTAGE HOSPITAL, BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE, DOMINICAN HOSPITAL, MERCY GENERAL HOSPITAL, SEQUOIA HOSPITAL, LAPALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EMANATE HEALTH INTER-COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MERCY AMERICAN RIVER HOSPITAL, MEMORIALCARE ORANGE COAST MEDICAL CENTER, PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-WHITTIER, DANIEL FREEMAN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, MERCY MT. SHASTA HOSPITAL, GLENDALE MEM HOSPITAL & HLTH CENTER, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CENTER- VAN NESS CAMPUS, ADVENTIST HEALTH LODI MEMORIAL, LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, METHODIST HOSPITAL OF SACRAMENTO, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCED DOMINICAN, DANIEL FREEMAN MARINA HOSPITAL, ROBERT F. KENNEDY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER, MARTIN LUTHER HOSPITAL, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MARIAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNADINO, MERCY HOSPITAL, CALIFORNIA PACIFIC MEDICAL CTR- DAVIES CAMPUS HOSP, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER REDDING, MILLS-PENINSULA MEDICAL CENTER, CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER LA, MARK TWAIN HOSPITAL, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LONG BEACH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL, SHERMAN WAY, MEMORIALCARE SADDLEBACK MEDICAL CENTER, EDEN MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL OF FOLSOM, NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Secretary Becerra, #5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #6 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Rubin, Lori) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnny Hillary Walker, III